EP1594796 - APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING A SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states iDispense, LLC. Ohio Limited Liability Company 3610 Holland-Sylvania Toledo, Ohio 43615 / US | [2008/33] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states Jaws International Ltd 3610 North Holland-Sylvania Road Toledo, OH 43615 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YACKO, R., Bruce 4739 Corey Road Toledo, OH 43623 / US | 02 /
MUELLER, Edward, L. 2833 Manchester Blvd. Toledo, OH 43606 / US | 03 /
WIEGAND, John, A. 5366 Radcliffe Road Sylvania, OH 43560 / US | 04 /
GAYER, Jeffrey, C. 4329 Fleetwood Lane Sylvania, OH 43560 / US | 05 /
SCHIMMOELLER, Todd, G. 143 Oakbrook Drive Ottawa, OH 45875 / US | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Giles, Ashley Simon Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Giles, Ashley Simon HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04704044.9 | 21.01.2004 | [2005/46] | WO2004US01541 | Priority number, date | US20030348646 | 21.01.2003 Original published format: US 348646 | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004065285 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1594796 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1594796 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/12, B67D3/00, B67D5/33 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
B67D7/346 (EP,US);
B67D7/02 (EP,US);
B67D7/348 (EP,US);
B67D7/84 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPENDEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE SUBSTANZ | [2005/46] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING A SUBSTANCE | [2005/46] | French: | APPAREIL DE DISTRIBUTION D'UNE SUBSTANCE | [2005/46] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 13.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 18.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 18.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2008 | BE | 13.08.2008 | CY | 13.08.2008 | CZ | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | EE | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | RO | 13.08.2008 | SI | 13.08.2008 | SK | 13.08.2008 | TR | 13.08.2008 | BG | 13.11.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | ES | 24.11.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | LU | 21.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | HU | 14.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
LU | 21.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
HU | 14.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
LU | 21.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
EE | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
RO | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
SK | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
BG | 13.11.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SI | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
ES | 24.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 13.08.2008 | |
ES | 24.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4929818 (BRADBURY HAROLD M [US], et al); | [A]EP0725035 (GEN DETERGENTS SPA [IT]); | [XY]US5566732 (NELSON PATRICK L [US]) [X] 1,2,10-12,22,23 * column 2, line 12 - line 29 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 60 * [Y] 3,4,13,14; | [A]US2002020742 (STREICHER STANLEY H [US], et al); | [XA]US2002030102 (BROWN LAURIE J [US]) [X] 1,2,10,15,18-23 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0047] * * figure - * [A] 24,35; | [Y]WO0242199 (ANNING BERNARD EDGAR [GB]) [Y] 3,4,13,14 * page 3, line 15 - line 21 *; | [PX]US2003051767 (COCCARO DEBORAH MARIE [US], et al) [PX] 1 * page 3, paragraph 37 *; | [PX]WO03024814 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [PX] 1 * page 12, line 29 - page 13, line 3 *; | [PX]US6578763 (BROWN LAURIE J [US]) [PX] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 4 - line 6 *; | [PX]WO03086952 (SYLTONE PLC [GB], et al) [PX] 1,5,24,35 * page 2, line 14 - line 15 * * page 3, line 24 - line 31 * * page 4, line 25 - line 27 *; | [PX]WO03095354 (ECOLAB INC [US]) [PX] 1 * page 8, line 1 - line 21 * |