EP1588558 - ROBUST MODE STAGGERCASTING WITHOUT ARTIFACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYCE, Jill 3 Brandywine Court Manalapan, NJ 07726 / US | 02 /
COOPER, Jeffrey 11 Toth Lane Rocky Hill, NJ 08553 / US | 03 /
RAMASWAMY, Kumar 71 Sayre Drive Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Rumpler, Wolfgang ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | Rumpler, Wolfgang Hofstetter, Schurack & Skora, Patentanwälte, Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/43] | Rittner, Karsten Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, European Patent Operations, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 04704056.3 | 21.01.2004 | [2005/43] | WO2004US01528 | Priority number, date | US20030443672P | 28.01.2003 Original published format: US 443672 P | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004070952 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1588558 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/66, H04N7/24, H04N7/58, H04L1/00, H04L27/34 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
H04L1/02 (EP,US);
H04N7/12 (KR);
H04N9/8042 (US);
H04L1/08 (EP,US);
H04L27/02 (EP,US);
H04N1/409 (KR);
H04N1/58 (KR);
H04N19/00 (EP,US);
H04N19/107 (EP,US);
H04N19/12 (EP,US);
H04N19/142 (EP,US);
H04N19/164 (EP,US);
H04N19/169 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/188 (EP,US);
H04N19/20 (EP,US);
H04N19/36 (EP,US);
H04N19/37 (EP,US);
H04N19/39 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/63 (EP,US);
H04N19/89 (EP,US);
H04N19/895 (EP,US);
H04N21/234327 (EP,US);
H04N21/234363 (EP,US);
H04N21/234381 (EP,US);
H04N21/2362 (EP,US);
H04N21/2365 (EP,US);
H04N21/2383 (EP,US);
H04N21/2662 (EP,US);
H04N21/4347 (EP,US);
H04N21/4382 (EP,US);
H04N21/4383 (EP,US);
H04N21/631 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (US);
H04L2001/0098 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/43] | H04N7/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/52] |
Former [2005/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAGGERCASTING IM ROBUSTEN MODUS OHNE ARTEFAKTE | [2005/43] | English: | ROBUST MODE STAGGERCASTING WITHOUT ARTIFACTS | [2005/43] | French: | DIFFUSION SUR FREQUENCES DECALEES EN MODE ROBUSTE SANS ARTEFACTS | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 01.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.03.2012 | 01.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/25] | 11.02.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/25] | 01.03.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2000078116 ; | [YA]US2002129374 (FREEMAN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [Y] 10,24,30,40,52 * paragraphs [0012] , [0102] , [0122] , [0207]; figure 5 * [A] ; | [X]US6480541 (GIROD BERND [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,8,9,17,19,23,31,33,39,43,44,50 * column 3, paragraphs 35-49 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 32 * * column 9, line 40 - column 10, line 15 * * column 11, line 60 - column 12, line 65 *; | [Y]US2002181581 (BIRRU DAGNACHEW [US], et al) [Y] 11,13,15,27,29,41,42,53,54 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] - [0029] - [0031] - [0042] , [0052] *; | [PXY]US6535717 (MATSUSHIMA KAZUHISA [JP], et al) [PX] 1-4,6-9,14,17-23,25,28,31-34,36-39,43-51 * column 2, line 53 - column 5, line 43 * * column 8, line 31 - column 13, line 39 * * column 20, line 65 - column 21, line 41 * * column 22, lines 3-23 * * column 28, lines 8-17 *[PY] 10,11,13,15,24,27,29,30,40-42,52-54 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000078116 A 20000314 (FUJITSU LTD; FFC:KK) [X] 1-4,6-9,14,17-23,25,28,31-34,36-39,43-51 * abstract * [Y] 10,11,13,15,24,27,29,30,40-42,52-54 | International search | [A]US6144400 (EBISAWA KAN [JP]); | [AE]US6701528 (ARSENAULT ROBERT G [US], et al); | [AE]US6771657 (ELSTERMANN ERIK JOHN [US]) |