EP1590221 - SERVO BRAKE SYSTEM COMPRISING A DECOMPRESSION PISTON INTEGRATED IN THE PRIMARY PISTON IN THE MASTER CYLINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOSCH SISTEMAS DE FRENADO, S.L. Apartado 9556, Balmes, 243 08080 Barcelona 6 / ES | [2005/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SACRISTAN, Fernando C/mare De Deuk Del Pilar, 5, Cabrils Barcelone 08348 / ES | 02 /
SIMON BACARDIT, Juan Calle Mallorca 451 6o, 4a Barcelone 08013 / ES | 03 /
BERTHOMIEU, Bruno C/giriti 2-4 Barcelone 08003 / ES | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Bosch Systèmes de Freinage Service Brevets 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Bosch Systèmes de Freinage, 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 04705087.7 | 26.01.2004 | [2005/44] | WO2004EP00620 | Priority number, date | FR20030000885 | 27.01.2003 Original published format: FR 0300885 | [2005/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004067346 | Date: | 12.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1590221 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1590221 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/575 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
B60T13/575 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SERVOBREMSSYSTEM MIT IM PRIMÄRKOLBEN IM HAUPTZYLINDERINTEGRIERTEM DEKOMPRESSIONSKOLBEN | [2005/44] | English: | SERVO BRAKE SYSTEM COMPRISING A DECOMPRESSION PISTON INTEGRATED IN THE PRIMARY PISTON IN THE MASTER CYLINDER | [2005/44] | French: | SERVOFREIN COMPORTANT UN PISTON DE DECOMPRESSION INTEGRE AU PISTON PRIMAIRE DU MAITRE CYLINDRE. | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 05.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2006 | CY | 17.05.2006 | CZ | 17.05.2006 | EE | 17.05.2006 | FI | 17.05.2006 | IE | 17.05.2006 | NL | 17.05.2006 | RO | 17.05.2006 | SI | 17.05.2006 | SK | 17.05.2006 | BG | 17.08.2006 | DK | 17.08.2006 | SE | 17.08.2006 | GR | 18.08.2006 | PT | 17.10.2006 | HU | 18.11.2006 | LU | 26.01.2007 | BE | 31.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | [2013/49] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CY | 17.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
HU | 18.11.2006 | ||
LU | 26.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
NL | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CZ | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 17.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19917281 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]FR2820388 (BOSCH SIST DE FRENADO SL [ES]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,3-9 *; | [A]DE10113292 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |