EP1606575 - LEAKY GUIDED-WAVE MODES USED IN INTERFEROMETRIC CONFOCAL MICROSCOPY TO MEASURE PROPERTIES OF TRENCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zetetic Institute Suite 206, 1665 E. 18th Street Tucson, AZ 85719 / US | [2005/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILL, Henry, Allen 1665 E. 18th Street, Suite 206 Tucson, AZ 85719 / US | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley Harrison Goddard Foote, Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04705634.6 | 27.01.2004 | [2005/51] | WO2004US02156 | Priority number, date | US20030442858P | 27.01.2003 Original published format: US 442858 P | US20030442892P | 28.01.2003 Original published format: US 442892 P | US20030443980P | 31.01.2003 Original published format: US 443980 P | [2005/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004068065 | Date: | 12.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1606575 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/04, G02B21/00 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
G01B9/04 (EP,US);
G01B9/02 (KR);
A45D8/006 (EP,US);
G02B21/0056 (EP,US);
G02B21/006 (EP,US);
G02B27/108 (EP,US);
G02B27/143 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/01] | G01B9/02 | ||
Former IPC [2005/51] | G01B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LECKENDE GEFÜHRTE WELLENMODEN, DIE IN DER INTERFEROMETRISCHEN KONFOKALEN MIKROSKOPIE ZUR MESSUNG VON GRABENEIGENSCHAFTEN VERWENDET WERDEN | [2005/51] | English: | LEAKY GUIDED-WAVE MODES USED IN INTERFEROMETRIC CONFOCAL MICROSCOPY TO MEASURE PROPERTIES OF TRENCHES | [2005/51] | French: | MODES DE FUITE D'ONDE GUIDEE UTILISES EN MICROSCOPIE CONFOCALE INTERFEROMETRIQUE POUR MESURER DES PROPRIETES DE TRANCHES | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 01.02.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5220403 (BATCHELDER JOHN S [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10 * column 3, line 8 - line 32 * * column 7, line 4 - column 15, line 54 * * figures 1a-4e *; | [A]DE4404154 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 33 - column 8, line 44; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0124235 (LAM RES CORP [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 2, line 3 - line 30 * * page 4, line 3 - line 23; figure 1 ** page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 7; figure 4 *; | [YD]US6445453 (HILL HENRY ALLEN [US]) [YD] 1 * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 17 * * column 15, line 17 - column 22, line 18; figure 1a * * column 38, line 55 - column 42, line 15; figures 7a-9 *; | [Y] - STANLEY S.C. CHIM, GORDON S. KINO, "OPTICAL PATTERN RECOGNITION MEASUREMENTS OF TRENCH ARRAYS WITH SUBMICROMETER DIMENSIONS", APPLIED OPTICS, (19940201), vol. 33, no. 4, pages 678 - 685, XP002407062 [Y] 1 * abstract * * page 678, beginning - page 681, left collumn; figures 1-3 * * page 683, third paragraph - page 684, end; figures 8-10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.33.000678 | [A] - C-H. CHOU, GORDON S. KINO, "Progress in optical imaging theory for trenches and lines", SPIE, INTEGRATED CIRCUIT METROLOGY, INSPECTION, AND PROCESS CONTROL VI, (1992), vol. 1673, pages 97 - 103, XP002407063 [A] 1-16 * Sections 11-3; figures 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.59787 | [A] - TAKADA K ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF A TRENCH DEPTH MEASUREMENT SYSTEM FOR VLSI DYNAMIC RANDOM ACCESS MEMORY VERTICAL CAPACITOR CELLS USING AN INTERFEROMETRIC TECHNIQUE WITH A MICHELSON INTERFEROMETER", APPLIED OPTICS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19890815), vol. 28, no. 16, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 3373 - 3381, XP000047210 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * Sections II, III-A and IV * * figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.28.003373 | [A] - T. VAN KESSEL, H.K. WICKRAMASINGHE, "Measurement of trench depth by infrared interferometry", OPTICS LETTERS, (19991201), vol. 24, no. 23, pages 1702 - 1704, XP002407064 [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 1702, paragraph 1 - page 1704, paragraph LAST * * figures 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.24.001702 | International search | [A]US6486965 (KIM HYUNG-SIK [KR]); | [A]US5384639 (WICKRAMASINGHE HEMANTHA K [US]); | [A]US5392118 (WICKRAMASINGHE HEMANTHA K [US]); | [A]US6707561 (BUDACH WOLFGANG ERNST GUSTAV [DE], et al) |