EP1602236 - METHOD TO TRANSMIT AND RECEIVE FONT INFORMATION IN STREAMING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital VC Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2020/01] |
Former [2019/10] | For all designated states InterDigital VC Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | ||
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAHUC, David 1 B rue Victor Janton Résid. Salvatierra Appt 29 35000 Rennes / FR | 02 /
VIELLARD, Thierry 5 Allée des Rosiers 35410 Osse / FR | 03 /
KERBIRIOU, Paul 9 Rue Yves de Kerguelen 35235 Thorigne-Fouillard / FR | [2019/27] |
Former [2005/49] | 01 /
SAHUC, David 1 B rue Victor Janton Résid. Salvatierra Appt 29 F-35000 Rennes / FR | ||
02 /
VIELLARD, Thierry 5 Allée des Rosiers F-35410 Osse / FR | |||
03 /
KERBIRIOU, Paul 9 Rue Yves de Kerguelen F-35235 Thorigne-Fouillard / FR | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2019/46] |
Former [2005/49] | Rittner, Karsten Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, European Patent Operations, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 04705813.6 | 28.01.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004EP00959 | Priority number, date | EP20030290324 | 10.02.2003 Original published format: EP 03290324 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004071097 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1602236 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1602236 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/236, H04N21/234, H04N21/2343, H04N21/44 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
G06F3/14 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (KR);
G06F40/109 (EP,US);
G09G5/225 (EP,US);
H04N21/23412 (EP,US);
H04N21/234318 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/49] | H04N7/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/46] |
Former [2005/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Übertragung und zum Empfangen von Schriftarteninformationen in Streaming-Systemen | [2019/22] | English: | METHOD TO TRANSMIT AND RECEIVE FONT INFORMATION IN STREAMING SYSTEMS | [2005/49] | French: | Méthode pour transmettre et recevoir une information de police dans les systèmes de diffusion en continu | [2019/22] |
Former [2005/49] | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG UND ZUM EMPFANGEN VON SCHRIFTARTENINFORMATIONEN IN STREAMING-SYSTEMEN | ||
Former [2005/49] | PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION ET DE RECEPTION D'INFORMATIONS DE CARACTERES DANS DES SYSTEMES DE FLUX DE DONNEES | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2004 | AT | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | DK | 13.11.2019 | EE | 13.11.2019 | ES | 13.11.2019 | FI | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | SE | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | SK | 13.11.2019 | IE | 28.01.2020 | LU | 28.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | BG | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/08] | AT | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
IE | 28.01.2020 | ||
LU | 28.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | CZ | 13.11.2019 | |
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
LU | 28.01.2020 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | CZ | 13.11.2019 | |
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 13.11.2019 | |
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 13.11.2019 | |
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 13.11.2019 | |
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9965230 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 3,5,10,12* page 7, line 7 - line 12 *; | [XY]WO0038170 (POWERTV INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * abstract * * section "Summary of the invention" * * page 8, line 4 - page 10, line 14 * * figure 3 * [Y] 5,12; | [A]US6141002 (KANUNGO RAJESH [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 54 - line 65 * * column 6, line 3 - line 17 * * column 9, line 65 - column 10, line 15 * * abstract *; | [A]WO0106792 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [A] 5,12 * page 9, line 1 - line 9 *; | [Y]EP1087617 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [Y] 5,12 * sections [0006]-[0008] *; | [X]US2001052901 (KAWABATA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * sections [0007]-[0012],[0014]-[0016], [0019],[0021],[0029],[0030],[0032],[0033],[0038],[0039],[0042]-[0044], [0053] * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2002087702 (MORI KOICHI [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * sections [0012],[0014],[0015],[0026],[0032]-[0042]* * figures 2,4 *; | [A]EP1267273 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A] - ELEFTHERIADIS A ET AL, "WORKING DRAFT 5.0 OF ISO/IEC 14496-1", ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 N1825, XX, XX, (19970725), page COMPLETE, XP000982956 [A] 1-14 * section 3.3.7 FontStyle2D, section 3.5.16 FontStyle * | [DA] - "INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - CODING OF AUDIO-VISUAL OBJECTS - PART 1: SYSTEMS", INTERNATIONAL STANDARD ISO/IEC, XX, XX, (200203), pages I - XV,1-350,352-472, XP001074670 [DA] 1-14 * section 8 "Object Description Framework", figure 5 * * section 9.4.2.53 FontStyle * | [DA] - "The Virtual Reality Modeling Language (vrml97)", INTERNATIONAL STANDARD ISO/IEC 14772-1 : 1997, URL: http://www.vrml.org/specifications/vrml97, XP002133320 [DA] 1-14 * section 6.20 FontStyle, section 6.47 Text * |