EP1587847 - PROCESS FOR REFINING CRUDE RESIN FOR ELECTRONIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD. 150, Nakamaruko Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | [2008/23] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states TOKYO OHKA KOGYO CO., LTD. 150, Nakamaruko Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HADA, Hideo, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | 02 /
IWAI, Takeshi, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | 03 /
TAKESHITA, Masaru, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | 04 /
HAYASHI, Ryotaro, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | 05 /
MUROI, Masaaki, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | 06 /
ATSUCHI, Kota, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | 07 /
TOMIDA, Hiroaki, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | 08 /
SHIOTANI, Kazuyuki, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | [2008/35] |
Former [2005/43] | 01 /
HADA, Hideo, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | ||
02 /
IWAI, Takeshi, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKESHITA, Masaru, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | |||
04 /
HAYASHI, Ryotaro, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | |||
05 /
MUROI, Masaaki, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | |||
06 /
ATSUCHI, Kota, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | |||
07 /
TOMIDA, Hiroaki, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa 211-0012 / JP | |||
08 /
SHIOTANI, Kazuyuki, c/o Tokyo Ohka Kogyo Co., Ltd. 150, Nakamaruko, Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagaa 211-0012 / JP | Representative(s) | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Hart Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04705903.5 | 28.01.2004 | [2005/43] | WO2004JP00776 | Priority number, date | JP20030020584 | 29.01.2003 Original published format: JP 2003020584 | JP20030409329 | 08.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003409329 | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004067688 | Date: | 12.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1587847 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1587847 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1587847 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/28, C08J3/14, G03F7/039 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
C08J3/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08F6/16 (KR);
C08F2/06 (KR);
C08F220/283 (KR);
G03F7/0397 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2333/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2006/20] |
Former [2005/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM RAFFINIEREN VON ROHEM HARZ FÜR ELEKTRONIKMATERIAL | [2005/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR REFINING CRUDE RESIN FOR ELECTRONIC MATERIAL | [2005/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE RAFFINAGE DE RESINE BRUTE DESTINEE A DU MATERIEL ELECTRONIQUE | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2002201232 (DAICEL CHEM) [X] 15-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0205034 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [PA]US6639035 (CHEN CHI-SHENG [TW], et al) [PA] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [PA]US2003114589 (SUETSUGU MASUMI [JP], et al) [PA] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0001684 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |