Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] |
31.08.2006 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
07.04.2006 | Change - designated states | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] |
07.04.2006 | Change - extension states | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] |
02.03.2006 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.09.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] |
16.09.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] |
15.09.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.09.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.10.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.08.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.08.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.07.2004 | PCT data prior to European publication |