EP1595176 - AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC (3-D) DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mems Optical, Inc. Unit 2, 205 Import Circle Huntsville, AL 35806 / US | [2005/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEZZANITI, Larry 119 Fenwick Place Harvest, Alabama 35749 / US | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Köpf, Alfred Rentsch & Partner AG ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Köpf, Alfred Rentsch & Partner Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9 Postfach 2441 8022 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2005/46] | Köpf, Alfred Rentsch & Partner Fraumünsterstrasse 9 8001 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 04706426.6 | 29.01.2004 | [2005/46] | WO2004US02315 | Priority number, date | US20030443184P | 29.01.2003 Original published format: US 443184 P | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004068190 | Date: | 12.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1595176 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/10 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
G02B30/27 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOSTEREOSKOPISCHE ANZEIGE (3-D) | [2005/46] | English: | AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC (3-D) DISPLAY | [2005/46] | French: | ECRAN D'AFFICHAGE (3D) AUTOSTEREOSCOPIQUE | [2005/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 01.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/06] | 12.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4069123 (SKOULTCHI MARTIN M, et al); | [A]US6064424 (VAN BERKEL CORNELIS [GB], et al); | [A]US6445406 (TANIGUCHI NAOSATO [JP], et al); | [A]US2003016444 (BROWN DANIEL M [US], et al) |