EP1590978 - QUALITY OF SERVICE DIFFERENTIATION IN WIRELESS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2013/42] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Zihua c/o Microsoft Corp., One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 02 /
ZHU, Wenwu c/o Microsoft Corp., One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Qian c/o Microsoft Corp., One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 04 /
ZHAO, Jun Microsoft Corp., One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04706514.9 | 29.01.2004 | [2005/44] | WO2004US02513 | Priority number, date | US20030377451 | 27.02.2003 Original published format: US 377451 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004077225 | Date: | 10.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1590978 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1590978 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/18, H04W74/00, H04W74/08, H04W28/24 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
H04W74/0816 (EP,US);
H04W28/24 (EP,KR,US);
H04W74/006 (EP,US);
H04W74/08 (KR);
H04W28/18 (EP,US);
H04W74/0833 (US)
|
Former IPC [2012/39] | H04W28/24, H04W74/00, H04W74/08 | ||
Former IPC [2011/02] | H04W74/08 | ||
Former IPC [2005/44] | H04Q7/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Title | German: | UNTERSCHEIDUNG VON DIENSTGÜTE IN DRAHTLOSEN NETZEN | [2005/44] | English: | QUALITY OF SERVICE DIFFERENTIATION IN WIRELESS NETWORKS | [2005/44] | French: | DIFFERENCIATION DE LA QUALITE DE SERVICE DANS DES RESEAUX SANS FIL | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 22.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2004 | AT | 16.10.2013 | BE | 16.10.2013 | BG | 16.10.2013 | CY | 16.10.2013 | CZ | 16.10.2013 | DK | 16.10.2013 | EE | 16.10.2013 | ES | 16.10.2013 | FI | 16.10.2013 | IT | 16.10.2013 | MC | 16.10.2013 | RO | 16.10.2013 | SE | 16.10.2013 | SI | 16.10.2013 | SK | 16.10.2013 | TR | 16.10.2013 | GR | 17.01.2014 | IE | 29.01.2014 | LU | 29.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | PT | 17.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 29.01.2004 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IE | 29.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IE | 29.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 29.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 29.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 29.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 16.10.2013 | |
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
SE | 16.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2002163933 (BENVENISTE MATHILDE [US]); | International search | [X]US2002163933 (BENVENISTE MATHILDE [US]); | [YE]US2004093421 (PENG YONG [CN], et al) | by applicant | US2002163933 |