EP1594411 - COMPRESSION SCREW APPARATUSES, SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Integra LifeSciences Corporation 311 Enterprise Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | [2008/42] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states Kinetikos Medical Incorporated 4115 Sorrento Valley Boulevard San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REINDEL, Eric, S. 1060 Aloha Drive Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 02 /
TRAIL, Ian, A. Laurenckirk 50 Worsley Road Greater Manchester M28 45H / GB | 03 /
WEISS, Arnold-Peter, C. 23 Nayatt Road Barrington, RI 02806 / US | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 440151 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/09] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/46] | Weise, Reinhard Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04706936.4 | 30.01.2004 | [2005/46] | WO2004US02573 | Priority number, date | US20030444565P | 03.02.2003 Original published format: US 444565 P | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004069031 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1594411 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/56, A61B17/58 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
A61B17/8685 (EP,US);
A61B17/863 (EP,US);
A61B17/8635 (EP,US);
A61B17/1615 (EP,US);
A61B17/864 (EP,US);
A61B17/8645 (EP,US);
Y10S606/916 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Extension states | AL | 24.08.2005 | LT | 24.08.2005 | LV | 24.08.2005 | MK | 24.08.2005 | Title | German: | KOMPRESSIONSSCHRAUBENGERÄTE, SYSTEME UND METHODEN | [2005/46] | English: | COMPRESSION SCREW APPARATUSES, SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2005/46] | French: | APPAREILS A VIS DE COMPRESSION, SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES | [2005/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 20.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 28.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9109572 (BAKINSKY NII TRAVMATO [SU]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 ** abstract *; | [XI]FR2699065 (HARDY JEAN MARIE [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,6,11,13-17,22-26 * figures 2-5,7-15 * * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 5 * * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 3 * [I] 4,7-10,12,18-21; | [XI]FR2745709 (CAFFINIERE JEAN YVES DE [FR]) [X] 26,27 * figures 1-6 * * page 1, line 14 - line 20 * * page 2, line 9 - line 20 * [I] 1-25; | [XI]EP1046376 (NEWDEAL [FR]) [X] 26,27 * figures 1,2,5,6 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0018] , [0019] , [0022] , [0038] * [I] 1-25 | International search | [A]US6306140 (SIDDIQUI IMRAN TAUHID [US]); | [A]US6048344 (SCHENK BEAT [US]); | [A]US5827285 (BRAMLET DALE G [US]); | [A]US4640271 (LOWER JERRY L [US]) | by applicant | FR2699065 | EP1046376 | FR2745709 |