EP1592477 - REVERSE CURRENT CONTROLLING ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axelgaard Manufacturing Company, Ltd. 1667 South Mission Road Fallbrook, CA 92028 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Axelgaard Manufacturing Company Ltd 1667 South Mission Road Fallbrook, CA 92028 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AXELGAARD, Jens 811 Tumbleweed Lane Fallbrook, CA 92028 / US | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04707103.0 | 30.01.2004 | [2005/45] | WO2004US02823 | Priority number, date | US20030359988 | 06.02.2003 Original published format: US 359988 | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004071274 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1592477 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/04 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
A61N1/0456 (EP,US);
A61N1/0452 (EP,US);
A61N1/0492 (EP,US);
A61N1/0476 (EP,US);
A61N1/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMKEHRSTROM-KONTROLLELEKTRODE | [2005/45] | English: | REVERSE CURRENT CONTROLLING ELECTRODE | [2005/45] | French: | ELECTRODE A REGULATION DE COURANT INVERSE | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 08.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/38] | 09.05.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5352315 (CARRIER LEVI A [US], et al) [Y] 4-9,13,14,16-19 * figure 1 * * figures 2a.1-2c.12 * * figure 4 * * column 4, lines 4-30 ** column 7, lines 54-59 *; | [Y]US5904712 (AXELGAARD JENS [US]) [Y] 1-3,10-12,15 * figure 7 * * column 4, lines 38-46 * * column 6, lines 15-25 * * claim 4 *; | [Y]US2002156357 (AXELGAARD JENS [US]) [Y] 1-19 * figure 1 * * figure 3 * * figure 4 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraphs [0041] - [0047] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0051] * * claim 23 *; | [Y]US2003004558 (GADSBY PETER D [US]) [Y] 4-8,13,14,16-18 * figure 4 * * figure 4a * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraphs [0075] - [0078] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0081] * | International search | [X]US2003004558 (GADSBY PETER D [US]) |