EP1613639 - AVERMECTINS SUBSTITUTED IN THE 4'' AND 4 -POSITIONS HAVING PESTICIDAL PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merial Limited 3239 Satellite Boulevard, Bldg. 500 Duluth, GA 30096-4640 / US | [2009/31] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASSAYRE, Jérôme, c/o Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | 02 /
TOBLER, Hans, c/o Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | 03 /
PITTERNA, Thomas, c/o Syngenta Crop. Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | 04 /
MAIENFISCH, Peter, c/o Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | 05 /
MURPHY KESSABI, Fiona, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | 06 /
QUARANTA, Laura, c/o Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | 07 /
HUETER, Ottmar Franz, Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Clyde-Watson, Zöe, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | Clyde-Watson, Zöe, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Clyde-Watson, Zöe, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2006/02] | Ward, Steven Paul, et al Syngenta Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Jealott's Hill International Research Centre, P.O. Box 3538 Bracknell RG42 6YA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04707515.5 | 03.02.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004EP00972 | Priority number, date | GB20030002548 | 04.02.2003 Original published format: GB 0302548 | [2006/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004069852 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1613639 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1613639 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/08, A61K31/70, A61P33/00 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
C07H17/08 (EP,US);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN 4''- BZW. 4'-POSITION SUBSTITUIERTE AVERMECTINE MIT PESTIZIDEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2006/02] | English: | AVERMECTINS SUBSTITUTED IN THE 4'' AND 4 -POSITIONS HAVING PESTICIDAL PROPERTIES | [2006/02] | French: | AVERMECTINES SUBSTITUEES DANS LES POSITIONS 4'' ET 4' AYANT DES PROPRIETES PESTICIDES | [2006/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2010 | BE | 06.10.2010 | CY | 06.10.2010 | CZ | 06.10.2010 | DK | 06.10.2010 | EE | 06.10.2010 | FI | 06.10.2010 | HU | 06.10.2010 | IT | 06.10.2010 | NL | 06.10.2010 | RO | 06.10.2010 | SE | 06.10.2010 | SI | 06.10.2010 | SK | 06.10.2010 | TR | 06.10.2010 | BG | 06.01.2011 | GR | 07.01.2011 | LU | 03.02.2011 | PT | 07.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CY | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
TR | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
LU | 03.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CY | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
LU | 03.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
LU | 03.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/10] | SI | 06.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02068442 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al); | [A] - JONES T K ET AL, "Synthesis and Biological Activity of 4a,4-Disubstituted Avermectins", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1994), vol. 42, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 1786 - 1790, XP002280646 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00044a041 |