EP1597611 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXAMINING AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2005/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLOMKA, Jens-Peter, Philips IP & Standards GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
SABCZYNSKI, Joerg, c/o Philips IP & Standards GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 03 /
BORGERT, Joern, c/o Philips IP & Standards GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04707609.6 | 03.02.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004IB00362 | Priority number, date | EP20030100330 | 13.02.2003 Original published format: EP 03100330 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004072685 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1597611 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01V5/00 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
G01V5/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UNDEINRICHTUNG ZUM UNTERSUCHEN EINES OBJEKTS | [2005/47] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXAMINING AN OBJECT | [2005/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'INSPECTER UN OBJET | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 04.11.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5367552 (PESCHMANN KRISTIAN R [US]) [A] 1,4,5,7-9 * abstract * * column 2, line 41 - line 47 * * column 3, line 40 - line 58 * * column 4, line 3 - line 7 * * column 4, line 29 - line 43 * * column 4, line 46 - line 53 * * column 4, line 64 - line 65 * * column 5, line 36 - line 40 * * column 6, line 40 - line 58 * * column 7, line 17 - line 60 * * column 8, line 4 - line 8 * * column 8, line 26 - line 50 * * column 9, line 26 - line 38 * * column 11, line 16 - line 37 * * figure - *; | [A]US5642393 (KRUG KRISTOPH D [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5,7-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 10 * * column 4, line 53 - line 57 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 27 * * column 8, line 55 - column 9, line 7 * * figure - *; | [A]WO9919716 (ANALOGIC CORP [US]) [A] 1,5,8,9 * abstract * * page 6, line 2 - line 28 * * page 14, line 1 - line 14 * * page 18, line 10 - page 19, line 30 * * page 20, line 15 - line 27 * * page 24, line 3 - line 24 ** figure - * |