EP1593258 - RANDOM ACCESS IMAGING SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation 4 Coliseum Centre, 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte North Carolina 28217 / US | [2009/17] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation 4 Coliseum Centre, 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte North Carolina 28217 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCNULTY, Peter, C. 8 Settlers Lane Sandy Hook, CT 06482 / US | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH, Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04707718.5 | 03.02.2004 | [2005/45] | WO2004US02963 | Priority number, date | US20030444436P | 03.02.2003 Original published format: US 444436 P | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004071069 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1593258 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1593258 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
H04N25/443 (EP,US);
H04N25/745 (US);
H04N25/40 (EP);
H04N25/76 (EP);
H04N25/7795 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDSENSOR MIT WAHLFREIEM ZUGRIFF | [2005/45] | English: | RANDOM ACCESS IMAGING SENSOR | [2005/45] | French: | CAPTEUR D'IMAGE A ACCES ALEATOIRE | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 27.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.04.2009 | CY | 22.04.2009 | CZ | 22.04.2009 | EE | 22.04.2009 | FI | 22.04.2009 | NL | 22.04.2009 | RO | 22.04.2009 | SI | 22.04.2009 | SK | 22.04.2009 | TR | 22.04.2009 | BG | 22.07.2009 | SE | 22.07.2009 | GR | 23.07.2009 | ES | 02.08.2009 | PT | 22.08.2009 | HU | 23.10.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CY | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
HU | 23.10.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CY | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
FI | 22.04.2009 | ||
NL | 22.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.08.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 02.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE3744128 (HEERING W PROF DR [DE], et al); | [Y]WO0138825 (CALIFORNIA INST TO TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | [X]US2001040635 (FOSSUM ERIC R [US], et al); | [XY]WO02073951 (FASTCOM TECHNOLOGY SA [CH], et al); | [X]US6509927 (PRATER JAMES S [US], et al) |