EP1714092 - RADIATOR APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2022 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Worldbest Corporation Offshore Incorporations Centre P.O. Box 957 Road Town Tortola / VG | [2006/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAN, Kam Ching Paul Flat A, 35/f, Wealthy Heights 35 Macdonnell Road Mid-Levels, Hong Kong / CN | [2011/44] |
Former [2006/43] | 01 /
CHAN, Kam Ching Paul Flat A, 35/f, Wealthy Heights, 35 Macdonnell Road Mid-Levels, Hong Kong / CN | Representative(s) | Bhimani, Alan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway GB-Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Bhimani, Alan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2006/43] | Hallam, Arnold Vincent, et al Marks & Clerk 144 New Walk Leicester LE1 7JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04708301.9 | 05.02.2004 | [2006/43] | WO2004CN00098 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005078356 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1714092 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1714092 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/00, F24C7/04, F24C7/06 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
H05B3/26 (EP,KR,US);
F24C15/22 (EP,KR,US);
F24C7/043 (EP,KR,US);
H05B3/008 (EP,KR,US);
H05B3/009 (EP,KR,US);
H05B2203/005 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/43] | F24H3/00, H05B3/00, F24C7/04, F24C7/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/43] | Title | German: | STRAHLERVORRICHTUNG | [2006/43] | English: | RADIATOR APPARATUS | [2006/43] | French: | RADIATEUR | [2006/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 27.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP11000495.9 / EP2498572 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2007 | 29.02.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.2008 | 28.02.2010 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | BG | 02.02.2012 | IT | 05.02.2012 | TR | 05.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2023/03] |
Former [2014/25] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
IT | 05.02.2012 | ||
TR | 05.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
IT | 05.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
IT | 05.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
IT | 05.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 02.11.2011 | |
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 02.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]GB191202764 (MARTIN HAROLD SHEEN) [X] 1-2 * page 3; figure 1 * [Y] 2-3,6 [I] 3,7-8; | [XI]US2613308 (LA MIRAND WALTER) [X] 1 * page 1; figure 3 * [I] 8; | [X]FR1190764 (METALLURG DU NICKEL) [X] 1,7* columns 2-3; figures 1-2 *; | [XI]US3356829 (BRANDENBURG FRANK J) [X] 1,9 * page 1; figures 1-3 * [I] 8; | [XI]GB1485121 (PARRY GREEN LTD) [X] 1 * page 2; figure 1 * [I] 8; | [XI]EP0274551 (KANTHAL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * columns 4-5; figure 1 * [I] 8; | [XI]DE3934393 (KRAUSS MARMORHEIZUNG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 8; | [XYI]DE19841674 (STEINMETZ MANFRIED [DE]) [X] 1 * columns 3-4; figure 2 * [Y] 2-3,6 [I] 8 | International search | [A]US1917461 (RANKIN WILLIAM A); | [X]US4551617 (CROSSLEY PETER W [GB], et al); | [X]US4563572 (HAGER JR NATHANIEL E [US]); | [A]US4739152 (DOWNS JAMES W [US]); | [A]US5335309 (FUJII KOJI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5628859 (JANIN JEAN-LOUIS [FR], et al); | [A]US5719991 (SANDHU GURTEJ S [US], et al) |