EP1613899 - INSTALLATION CONSISTING IN AN ELECTRICAL CABINET, A MACHINE COMPARTMENT OR SIMILAR, AND A COOLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/02] | RECIRCULATION COOLING SYSTEM | ||
[2011/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2013 [2013/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rittal GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Stützelberg 35745 Herborn / DE | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINDER, Henno Am Langacker 8 35080 Bad Endbach / DE | 02 /
MÜLLER, Andreas Rosenweg 94 57258 Freudenberg / DE | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/02] | 01 /
HINDER, Henno Am Langacker 8 35080 Bad Endbach / DE | ||
02 /
MÜLLER, Andreas Bruchsgarten 38 57258 Freudenberg / DE | Representative(s) | Tönhardt, Marion, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Tönhardt, Marion, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/02] | Fleck, Hermann-Joseph, et al Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 04708354.8 | 05.02.2004 | [2006/02] | WO2004EP01037 | Priority number, date | DE2003116045 | 07.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10316045 | [2006/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004090430 | Date: | 21.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1613899 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1613899 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F24F1/02, F25D17/02, F25D31/00, H05K7/20 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
F25D31/002 (EP,US);
F24F1/022 (EP,US);
F24F13/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2006/28] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG AUS EINEM SCHALTSCHRANK, EINEM MASCHINENGEHÄUSE ODER DGL. UND EINER RÜCKKÜHLANLAGE | [2011/07] | English: | INSTALLATION CONSISTING IN AN ELECTRICAL CABINET, A MACHINE COMPARTMENT OR SIMILAR, AND A COOLING SYSTEM | [2011/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF COMPOSÉ D'UNE ARMOIRE ÉLECTRIQUE, D'UN COMPARTIMENT MOTEUR OU SIMILAIRE, ET D'UNE INSTALLATION DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2011/07] |
Former [2006/02] | R CKK HLANLAGE | ||
Former [2006/02] | RECIRCULATION COOLING SYSTEM | ||
Former [2006/02] | INSTALLATION DE REFROIDISSEMENT PAR CIRCULATION | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 29.04.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.05.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 29.08.2007 | Appeal received No. T1967/07 | 03.12.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.04.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2006 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE4413130 (LOH KG RITTAL WERK [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, lines 34-51; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 14-21 * * column 2, lines 36-44 * * column 3, lines 53-57 * * column 3, lines 59-64 * * column 4, lines 46-52 *; | [Y]FR2770897 (OULOUNIS KAMAL [DZ]) [Y] 1-4 * page 1, lines 1,2; figures 2,3 * * page 1, lines 22-28 * * page 2, lines 7,8 * * page 2, lines 15-27 *; | [Y]US4776180 (PATTON SR JAMES M [US], et al) [Y] 4 * column 5, lines 36-43; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5839295 (LEHMANN WALTER E [CA]) [Y] 5 * column 4, lines 46-48 * * column 4, lines 56-58; figure 3 * * column 4, lines 59,60 * * column 5, lines 43-46 *; | [Y]DE19921554 (BADER ENGINEERING GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6,7,9 * column 3, lines 37-41; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]GB1537821 (MK REFRIGERATION LTD) [Y] 8 * sentences 65-68; figure 1 *; | [A]US2002166334 (HOUK THOMAS I [US], et al) [A] 6 * page 5, column 2, paragraph 37; figure 8 * * claim 3 *; | [A]EP1026932 (BURN HEINZ [CH]) [A] 6 * column 6, paragraph 34 * * column 7, paragraph 42 *; | [A] - CONTINO J ET AL, Water-cooling applications for telecommunications and computer energy systems, PAGE(S) 441-447, XP010078308 | by applicant | DE4413130 | DE19921554 | EP1026932 |