EP1774761 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR INTRODUCING EVENTS INTO A CURRENT VOICE CALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kelly, Gerard Anthony 90 Grace Park Meadows, Drumcondra Dublin 9 / IE | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/16] | Application number, filing date | 04708424.9 | 05.02.2004 | [2007/16] | WO2004IE00018 | Priority number, date | IE20030000072 | 05.02.2003 Original published format: IE 20030072 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004071061 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1774761 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04M7/00 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
H04M7/00 (EP,US);
H04M3/42391 (EP,US);
H04M3/4285 (EP,US);
H04M3/493 (EP,US);
H04M3/567 (EP,US);
H04M7/128 (EP,US);
H04M7/1295 (EP,US);
H04M2203/2061 (EP,US);
H04M2203/5018 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM EINFÜHREN VON EREIGNISSEN IN EINE AKTUELLE VOICE-VERBINDUNG | [2007/16] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR INTRODUCING EVENTS INTO A CURRENT VOICE CALL | [2007/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR INTRODUIRE DES EVENEMENTS DANS UNE COMMUNICATION VOCALE EN COURS | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 20.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/11] | 26.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/11] | Public notification(s) | Noting of loss of rights pursuant to rule 69(1) EPC EPO form 1205A dated 20.12.05 | Kelly, Gerard Anthony 60 Grace Park Meadows, Drumcondra Dublin 9 / IE | [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.05.2006 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | BG   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | CY   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | CZ   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | DK   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | EE   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | FI   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | HU   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | IE   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | MC   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | PT   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | RO   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | SI   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | SK   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | 19.05.2006 | TR   M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.05.2006 | M02   Fee paid on   28.07.2006 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2006 | 28.02.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1244281 (SWISSCOM AG [CH]) [X] 1-5,11,12,14,15,21-34,40,41,43,44,50-54 * paragraphs [0032] , [0034] , [0037] , [0039] , [0042] , [0047] , [0051] , [0053] , [0055] - [0058]; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1091548 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) [X] 1-10,13,15-39,42,44-54 * paragraphs [0006] , [0014] - [0017] - [0021] , [0025] , [0030]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2002038212 (BERNARD ALAIN [FR]) [A] 14,43 * abstract *; | [A]US6385202 (KATSEFF HOWARD PAUL [US], et al) [A] 24,53 * abstract * * column 4, lines 7-23 * |