EP1589834 - ENTERAL COMPOSITION FOR THE PREVENTION AND/OR TREATMENT OF SEPSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPEELMANS, Gelske Opal 15 NL-6208 LW WAGENINGEN / NL | 02 /
VRIESEMA, Adrianus Johannes Maria Fluweelmos 6 NL-3994 KR HOUTEN / NL | 03 /
VREUGDENHILL, Anita Corinne Eugenie Brommelen 2 NL-6243 CP GEULLE / NL | 04 /
BUURMAN, Willem Andries H. Smeetsstraat 19 NL-6245 GB EIJSDEN / NL | 05 /
GREVE, Johannes Wilhelmus Maria Bergweg 52 NL-6212 CX MAASTRICHT / NL | 06 /
HOFMAN, Zandrie Bereklouw 18 NL-6721 RH BENNEKOM / NL | 07 /
KIVIT, Inge Breedstraat 13 NL-5321 VN HEDEL / NL | 08 /
HAGEMAN, Robert Johan Joseph Hamsterlaan 12 NL-6705 CT WAGENINGEN / NL | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04708526.1 | 05.02.2004 | [2005/44] | WO2004NL00082 | Priority number, date | EP20030075356 | 05.02.2003 Original published format: EP 03075356 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004068969 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1589834 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1589834 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/30, A23L1/29, A23K1/16, A61K31/685 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A23J7/00 (EP,US);
A23L33/115 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/685 (EP,US);
A61K35/57 (EP,US);
A61K35/60 (EP,US);
A61K36/185 (EP,US);
A61K36/28 (EP,US);
A61K36/286 (EP,US);
A61K36/31 (EP,US);
A61K36/35 (EP,US);
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A61K36/63 (EP,US);
A61K36/889 (EP,US);
A61K36/899 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/54246, A23V2250/61, A23V2250/616, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/1846, A23V2250/1848, A23V2250/194 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/54246, A23V2250/61, A23V2250/616, A23V2250/628, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/1846, A23V2250/1848 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTERALPRÄPARAT ZUR VORBEUGUNG GEGEN BZW. BEHANDLUNG VON SEPSIS | [2005/44] | English: | ENTERAL COMPOSITION FOR THE PREVENTION AND/OR TREATMENT OF SEPSIS | [2005/44] | French: | COMPOSITION ENTERALE POUR LA PREVENTION ET/OU LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE SEPTICEMIE | [2005/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 13.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.04.2007 | CZ | 11.04.2007 | EE | 11.04.2007 | FI | 11.04.2007 | RO | 11.04.2007 | SI | 11.04.2007 | SK | 11.04.2007 | BG | 11.07.2007 | SE | 11.07.2007 | GR | 12.07.2007 | PT | 11.09.2007 | HU | 12.10.2007 | [2010/34] |
Former [2009/35] | CY | 11.04.2007 | |
CZ | 11.04.2007 | ||
EE | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 11.04.2007 | |
EE | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 11.04.2007 | |
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
RO | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 11.04.2007 | |
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | CZ | 11.04.2007 | |
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SK | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 11.04.2007 | |
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
BG | 11.07.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 11.04.2007 | |
SI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | SI | 11.04.2007 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO9015609 (MED TAL INC [US]) [AD] 1-24 * page 1, lines 4-6 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 24 * * page 5, lines 16-29 * * page 7, lines 20-22 *; | [A]US5344822 (LEVINE DANIEL M [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * column 4, lines 9-25,52-54 * * claims 1-7 *; | [AD]DE19644518 (NUTRICIA NV [NL]) [AD] 1-24 * page 2, lines 5,6,47-53 *; | [AD]EP1090636 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [AD] 1-24 * page 2, lines 19-21,35 * * page 3, lines 13,14,35,36 * * table 6 *; | [XA]EP1106181 (MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 8-24 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] - [0027] , [0030] , [0031] , [0036] - [0039] * * Test diet 2 of;; example 1 * * example 3 * * paragraph [0062] * [A] 1-7; | [A]WO0184961 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-24 * page 1, lines 6-9 ** examples 2,5 *; | [PDA]WO03009704 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [PDA] 1-24 * page 1, lines 3-6 * * page 4, lines 15-18 *; | [AD] - WANG X D ET AL, "PHOSPHOLIPIDS PREVENT ENTERIC BACTERIAL TRANSLOCATION IN THE EARLY STAGE OF EXPERIMENTAL ACUTE LIVER FAILURE IN THE RAT", SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY,, (1994), vol. 29, no. 12, ISSN 0036-5521, pages 1117 - 1121, XP009013469 [AD] 1-24 * abstract * * page 1117, paragraph 2 * * page 1121, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/00365529409094897 |