EP1731481 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING SLUSH NITROGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mayekawa Mfg. Co., Ltd. 13-1, Botan 2-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-0046 / JP | [2006/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACHIDA, Akito c/o Mayekawa Mfg.co., Ltd. 13-1, Botan 2-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 1350046 / JP | 02 /
HATTORI, Kazuhiro c/o Mayekawa Mfg.co., Ltd. 13-1, Botan 2-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 1350046 / JP | 03 /
MATSUO, Kouichi c/o Mayekawa Mfg.co., Ltd. 13-1, Botan 2-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 1350046 / JP | [2013/15] |
Former [2006/50] | 01 /
MACHIDA, Akito, C/o Mayekawa Mfg.Co., Ltd. 13-1, Botan 2-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 1350046 / JP | ||
02 /
HATTORI, Kazuhiro, C/o Mayekawa Mfg.Co., Ltd. 13-1, Botan 2-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 1350046 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUO, Kouichi, C/o Mayekawa Mfg.Co., Ltd. 13-1, Botan 2-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 1350046 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2013/36] |
Former [2009/51] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/50] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04708884.4 | 06.02.2004 | [2006/50] | WO2004JP01249 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005075352 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1731481 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1731481 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C01B21/04, B01J3/00, F25J1/00 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
B01B1/005 (EP,US);
C01B21/00 (EP,US);
B01D3/06 (EP,US);
C01P2006/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/50] | C01B21/04, B01J3/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2007/20] |
Former [2006/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PASTENFÖRMIGEM STICKSTOFF | [2006/50] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING SLUSH NITROGEN | [2006/50] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE FABRICATION D AZOTE PATEUX | [2006/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2006 | Translation filed | 01.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 09.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4009013 (SCHRAWER ROLF, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 12; claims 1,4 * [Y] 3-5; | [A]US4488407 (DELANO MARK A [US]) [A] 2,3* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0641981 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [Y] 3-5 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 24; figure 1; claim - *; | [XY] - ISHIMOTO J ET AL, "Basic study on two-phase flow characteristics of slush nitrogen in a pipe", INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (2004), Database accession no. 8338512, XP002472067 [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 3-5 | [ ] - ADVANCES IN CRYOGENIC ENGINEERING. CRYOGENIC ENGINEERING CONFERENCE - CEC 22-26 SEPT. 2003 ANCHORAGE, AK, USA, AIP Conference Proceedings AIP USA, (200309), no. 710, ISSN 0094-243X, pages 1099 - 1106 | International search | [A]JPH0571841 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2000258053 (BOEING CO); | [X]US6405541 (BRUNNHOFER KLAUS [AT]) |