EP1598372 - POLYMER PARTICLE COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | ||
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Takashi, C/o Takasago Kogyou-sho, Kaneka Corporation 1-8, Takasagocho-miyamaecho Takasago-shi Hyogo 6760027 / JP | 02 /
TAKEDA, Yoshinori C/o Takasago Kogyou-sho, Kaneka Corporation 1-8, Takasagocho-miyamaecho Takasago-shi Hyogo 6760027 / JP | [2010/14] |
Former [2005/47] | 01 /
UEDA, Takashi, C/o Takasago Kogyou-sho, Kaneka 1-8, Takasagocho-miyamaecho Takasago-shi Hyogo 6760027 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKEDA, Yoshinori C/o Takasago Kogyou-sho, Kaneka 1-8, Takasagocho-miyamaecho Takasago-s hi, Hyogo 6760027 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/47] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04708913.1 | 06.02.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004JP01360 | Priority number, date | JP20030047803 | 25.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003047803 | [2005/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004076538 | Date: | 10.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1598372 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1598372 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/00 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
C08F2/20 (EP,US);
C08J3/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/005 (EP,US);
C08J3/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08J2333/12 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/24] |
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMERTEILCHENZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2005/47] | English: | POLYMER PARTICLE COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2005/47] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PARTICULES POLYMERES ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE CES PARTICULES | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2005 | Translation filed | 18.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 16.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.04.2010 | IT | 28.04.2010 | [2011/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000112174 ; | [X]GB1087390 (SOLVAY) [X] 1 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4463032 (ARNDT PETER J [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * column 4, line 20 - line 25 *; | [PA]WO03093353 (KANEKA CORP [JP], et al) [PA] 1-11 * claims 1-16 *; | EP1464666 [ ] (KANEKA CORP [JP]); | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 2000-379117, XP002490445 & JP2000112174 A 20000421 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1 * column A * | International search | [A]EP0510805 (ICI AMERICA INC [US]) |