EP1595182 - HALOGENATED OXIME DERIVATIVES AND THE USE THEREOF AS LATENT ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Ciba Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMATO, Hitoshi 2-29-11, Yamatedainishi Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-0886 / JP | 02 /
ASAKURA, Toshikage 4-16-46, Minoo Minoo-shi, Osaka, 562-0001 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMOTO, Akira 2-20-24-401,Mukonoso-higashi Amagasaki, Hyogo 661-0032 / JP | 04 /
MURER, Peter Spitzgartenweg 2 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | 05 /
HINTERMANN, Tobias Steinenvorstadt 67 CH-4051 Basel / CH | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 04709242.4 | 09.02.2004 | [2005/46] | WO2004EP50096 | Priority number, date | EP20030405103 | 19.02.2003 Original published format: EP 03405103 | EP20030405130 | 27.02.2003 Original published format: EP 03405130 | EP20030405432 | 17.06.2003 Original published format: EP 03405432 | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004074242 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1595182 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1595182 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C251/48, C07C381/00, C07D209/86, C07D307/91, C07D333/76, G03F7/004 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
C07C251/48 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C381/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D209/86 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D307/91 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D333/76 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G03F7/0007 (EP,CN,US);
G03F7/0045 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G03F7/0046 (EP,CN,US);
G03F7/0382 (EP,CN,US);
G03F7/0392 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C2603/18 (EP,KR,US);
C07C2603/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07C2603/40 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/46] | G03F7/004, C07C317/04, C07C251/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/40] |
Former [2005/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HALOGENIERTE OXIM-DERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS LATENTE SÄUREN | [2015/23] | English: | HALOGENATED OXIME DERIVATIVES AND THE USE THEREOF AS LATENT ACIDS | [2005/46] | French: | DÉRIVÉS D'OXIMES HALOGÉNÉS ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME ACIDES LATENTS | [2015/23] |
Former [2005/46] | HALOGENIERTE OXIMDERIVATE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR ALS LATENTE SÄUREN | ||
Former [2005/46] | DERIVES D'OXIMES HALOGENES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME ACIDES LATENTS | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.02.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 27.02.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.03.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2004 | AT | 30.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | BG | 30.09.2015 | CY | 30.09.2015 | CZ | 30.09.2015 | DK | 30.09.2015 | EE | 30.09.2015 | ES | 30.09.2015 | FI | 30.09.2015 | IT | 30.09.2015 | MC | 30.09.2015 | NL | 30.09.2015 | RO | 30.09.2015 | SE | 30.09.2015 | SI | 30.09.2015 | SK | 30.09.2015 | TR | 30.09.2015 | GR | 31.12.2015 | PT | 01.02.2016 | GB | 09.02.2016 | IE | 09.02.2016 | LU | 09.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 09.02.2004 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
GB | 09.02.2016 | ||
IE | 09.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 09.02.2004 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
GB | 09.02.2016 | ||
IE | 09.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
GB | 09.02.2016 | ||
IE | 09.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 09.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
BE | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
LU | 09.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
GR | 31.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [DX]US4566901 (MARTIN HENRY [CH], et al) [DX] 1-3,11* column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 59 *; | [X]US6261738 (ASAKURA TOSHIKAGE [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 12, line 49 - column 14, line 56 * * column 36, lines 15-39; claim - *; | [X]US2001037037 (DIETLIKER KURT [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,4-20 * paragraph [0105]; claim - *; | [X]WO0225376 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-20 * claim - *; | [X]WO02100903 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,4,9-20 * page 20, line 22 - page 21, line 8; claims 1,4,5,10-14 * |