EP1592810 - METHODS AND MEANS FOR NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genizon Biosciences, Inc. 880 McCaffrey Street St. Laurent QC H4T 2C7 / CA | [2008/11] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Genizon Svenska AB Nobels Vag 12a 17177 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINNARSSON, Sten, Global Genomics AB Tomtebodavagen 21B S-171 77 Stockholm / SE | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Walton, Seán Malcolm, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04709304.2 | 09.02.2004 | [2005/45] | WO2004IB00803 | Priority number, date | GB20030003191 | 12.02.2003 Original published format: GB 0303191 | US20030446553P | 12.02.2003 Original published format: US 446553 P | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004072294 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1592810 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2535/101, C12Q2537/149, C12Q2523/319 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZIERUNG | [2005/45] | English: | METHODS AND MEANS FOR NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCING | [2005/45] | French: | PROCEDES ET MOYEN DE SEQUENCAGE DE SEQUENCES NUCLEOTIDIQUES | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 30.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/12] | 30.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.04.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9013666 (AMERSHAM INT PLC [GB]) [X] 1,29,35 * see whole doc. esp. claims *; | [DX]WO9321340 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [DX] 1,29,35 * see whole doc. esp. claims 1,3,18 and examples *; | [X]EP1038973 (US BIOCHEMICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1,29,35 * see whole doc. esp. p.3, l.10ff. and p.4, l.30 ff. *; | [X]WO9747761 (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [X] 1 * see whole doc. esp. claims *; | [X]US6162602 (GAUTSCH JAMES W [US]) [X] 31-34 * see whole doc. esp. claims *; | [X]WO9629097 (RES CORP TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 24,42 * see whole doc. esp. Fig 1a and Tab. 2 *; | [X]WO9317127 (OREGON STATE [US]) [X] 21-28,42-52 * see whole doc. esp. claims and figures *; | [X]WO9704131 (FORSYTH DENTAL INFIRMARY [US]) [X] 24,42-52 * see whole doc. esp. claims and Fig 1 *; | [A]EP1162278 (WANG XIAO BING [US], et al) [A] 1-21,25-30,35-41 * see whole doc, esp. claims and figures *; | [A]US6284497 (SABANAYAGAM CHANDRAN R [US], et al) [A] 21-28,42-52 * see whole doc. esp. claims and figures *; | [X]WO0140516 (MOLECULAR STAGING INC [US]) [X] 24,42-52 * see whole doc. esp. claims and figures * | [A] - RONAGHI M ET AL, "REAL-TIME DNA SEQUENCING USING DETECTION OF PYROSPHOSPHATE RELEASE", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (19961101), vol. 242, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 84 - 89, XP002055379 [A] 1-21,25-30,35-41 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1996.0432 | [A] - JONES D H, "PANHANDLE PCR", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, US, (19950401), vol. 4, no. 5, ISSN 1088-9051, pages S195 - 201, XP000506287 [A] * the whole document * | [DA] - LIZARDI P M ET AL, "MUTATION DETECTION AND SINGLE-MOLECULE COUNTING USING ISOTHERMAL ROLLING-CIRCLE AMPLIFICATION", NATURE GENETICS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199807), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 225 - 232, XP000856939 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/898 |