EP1593342 - MAGNETIC FIELD-PRODUCING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/27] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states Neomax Co., Ltd. 7-19, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | ||
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states SUMITOMO SPECIAL METALS COMPANY LIMITED 7-19, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AOKI, Masaaki 1-10-5-501, Kamihamuro Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1044 / JP | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/45] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04709360.4 | 09.02.2004 | [2005/45] | WO2004JP01344 | Priority number, date | JP20030032111 | 10.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003032111 | [2005/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004069052 | Date: | 19.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1593342 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1593342 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/055, G01R33/383, H01F7/02 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
G01R33/383 (EP,US);
H01F7/0278 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [2006/22] |
Former [2005/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MAGNETFELDPRODUZIERENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2005/45] | English: | MAGNETIC FIELD-PRODUCING DEVICE | [2005/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF PRODUISANT UN CHAMP MAGNETIQUE | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2005 | Translation filed | 10.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 11.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.12.2011 | NL | 14.12.2011 | GB | 14.03.2012 | [2013/10] |
Former [2012/50] | IT | 14.12.2011 | |
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 14.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08201408 (UNISIA JECS CORP) [X] 2 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH08294261 (DAIFUKU KK) [X] 2 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19709297 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 2-10 * column 1, line 35 - column 3, line 45; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0875768 (ESAOTE SPA [IT]) [X] 2-10 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 58 * * column 4, line 47 - column 9, line 39 * * claims 1,17 * * figures 1,3-7 *; | [X]EP0921408 (ESAOTE SPA [IT]) [X] 2-10 * the whole document *; | [X] - BUSH E D JR, "Permanent quadrupole magnets", 1976 PROTON LINEAR ACCELERATOR CONFERENCE ATOMIC ENERGY OF CANADA CHALK RIVER, ONT., CANADA, (1976), pages 363 - 368, XP008103569 [X] 2 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS60257109 (SUMITOMO SPEC METALS); | [A]JPS61159950 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [Y]JPH04371136 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP); | [X]JPH10234704 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP) | Examination | JPS61159950 | EP0399789 | US5016638 | GB2244134 | EP0618457 | US5614880 | by applicant | JPS61159950 | GB2244134 | US5614880 |