EP1594889 - NELL PEPTIDE EXPRESSION SYSTEMS AND BONE FORMATION ACTIVITY OF NELL PEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states The Regents of The University of California 12th Floor 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | ||
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland California 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TING, Kang 115 N. Doheny Drive Beverly Hills, CA 90211 / US | 02 /
KURODA, Shunichi Osaka University, 8-1 Mihogaoka Ibaraki, Osaka 567-0047 / JP | 03 /
WU, Ben 2253 Selby Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90064 / US | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH, Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04709500.5 | 09.02.2004 | [2005/46] | WO2004US03808 | Priority number, date | US20030445672P | 07.02.2003 Original published format: US 445672 P | WO2003US29281 | 15.09.2003 Original published format: PCT/US0329/281 | [2007/36] |
Former [2005/46] | US20030445672P | 07.02.2003 | |
WO2003US28281 | 15.09.2003 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004072100 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1594889 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1594889 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/62, C12N15/86, C07K14/435, C07K14/51, A61K38/18 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
C07K14/51 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/12] | C12N15/12, C12N15/63, C07K14/51, A61K38/17 | ||
Former IPC [2007/20] | A61K38/16, C12N15/00, C12N15/12, C12N15/63, C07K14/435 | ||
Former IPC [2005/46] | C07K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NELL-PEPTIDEXPRESSIONSSYSTEME UND KNOCHENBILDENDE AKTIVITÄT DES NELL-PEPTIDS | [2005/46] | English: | NELL PEPTIDE EXPRESSION SYSTEMS AND BONE FORMATION ACTIVITY OF NELL PEPTIDE | [2005/46] | French: | SYSTEMES D'EXPRESSION DE PEPTIDES NELL ET ACTIVITE DE FORMATION OSSEUSE DE PEPTIDE NELL | [2005/46] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 29.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2004 | AT | 06.04.2011 | BE | 06.04.2011 | CY | 06.04.2011 | CZ | 06.04.2011 | DK | 06.04.2011 | EE | 06.04.2011 | FI | 06.04.2011 | IT | 06.04.2011 | NL | 06.04.2011 | RO | 06.04.2011 | SE | 06.04.2011 | SI | 06.04.2011 | SK | 06.04.2011 | TR | 06.04.2011 | BG | 06.07.2011 | GR | 07.07.2011 | PT | 08.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/32] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | SI | 06.04.2011 | |
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | SI | 06.04.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0796913 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * claims 19-24; sequences 34-39 *; | [Y]WO0124821 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO03006483 (APPLERA CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * page 41, line 18 - line 21 * * page 43, line 3 - line 6 * * claims 1-23 *; | [Y] - TESSIER D C ET AL, "Enhanced secretion from insect cells of a foreign protein fused to the honeybee melittin signal peptide.", GENE 15 FEB 1991, (19910215), vol. 98, no. 2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 177 - 183, XP002467777 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(91)90171-7 | [Y] - LI Y ET AL, "Control of expression, glycosylation, and secretion of HIV-1 gp120 by homologous and heterologous signal sequences.", VIROLOGY OCT 1994, (199410), vol. 204, no. 1, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 266 - 278, XP002467778 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1994.1531 | [Y] - SARKAR M ET AL, "Removal of 106 amino acids from the N-terminus of UDP-GlcNAc: alpha-3-D-mannoside beta-1,2-N-acetylglucosaminyltransferase I does not inactivate the enzyme.", GLYCOCONJUGATE JOURNAL FEB 1998, (199802), vol. 15, no. 2, ISSN 0282-0080, pages 193 - 197, XP002467779 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1006928624913 | [Y] - SHUN'ICHI KURODA ET AL, "BIOCHEMICAL CHARACTERIZATION AND EXPRESSION ANALYSIS OF NEURAL THROMBOSPONDIN-1-LIKE PROTEINS NELL1 AND NELL2", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (199911), vol. 265, no. 1, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 79 - 86, XP001051695 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1999.1638 | [Y] - ELKINS D.A., ROSSI, J.,, "Protein kinase C-binding protein NELL2 precursor (NEL-like protein) (Mouse)", EMBL, EMBL Hinxton UK, (19971101), Database accession no. Q61220, URL: EBI, XP002467817 [Y] 1-18 * column A * | [A] - WATANABE T K ET AL, "CLONING AND CHARACTERIZATION OF TWO NOVEL HUMAN CDNAS (NELL1 AND NELL2) ENCODING PROTEINS WITH SIX EGF-LIKE REPEATS", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, (19961215), vol. 38, no. 3, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 273 - 276, XP002064052 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1996.0628 | [A] - KURODA S ET AL, "Involvement of epidermal growth factor-like domain of NELL proteins in the novel protein-protein interaction with protein kinase C", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (1999), vol. 265, no. 3, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 752 - 757, XP003007039 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1999.1753 | International search | [A] - LUCE M.J. AND BURROWS P.D., "The neuronal EGF-related genes NELL1 and NELL2 are expressed in hemopoietic cells and developmentally regulated in the B lineage", GENE, (1999), vol. 231, pages 121 - 126, XP004166785 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(99)00093-1 | [A] - TING K. ET AL., "Human NELL-1 expressed in unilateral coronal synostosis", JOURNAL OF BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 80 - 89, XP002937149 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1359/jbmr.1999.14.1.80 | by applicant | WO0124821 | WO03006483 | - TESSIER D.C. ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 98, no. 2, pages 177 - 183 | - LI, Y. ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1994), vol. 204, no. 1, pages 266 - 278 | - SARKAR M. ET AL., GLYCOCONJUGATE J., (1998), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 193 - 197 | - WATANABE, T.K. ET AL., Genomics, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1996), vol. 38, pages 273 - 276 | - KURODA, S. ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1999), vol. 265, no. 3, pages 752 - 757 |