EP1597418 - POLYPROPYLENE FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis Technology Oy P.O. Box 330 06201 Porvoo / FI | [2005/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN PARIDON, Henk Ten Bosch 15 3271 Averbode / BE | 02 /
NOYNAERT, Nancy Begijnenbosstraat 70 B-3850 Nieuwerken / BE | [2007/01] |
Former [2005/47] | 01 /
VAN PARIDON, Henk F. Smeyersstraat 43 B-3270 Scherpenheuvel-Zichem / BE | ||
02 /
NOYNAERT, Nancy Begijnenbosstraat 70 B-3850 Nieuwerken / BE | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/47] | VA TECH Patente GmbH & Co Stahlstrasse 21a 4031 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 04709618.5 | 10.02.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004EP01210 | Priority number, date | EP20030004115 | 26.02.2003 Original published format: EP 03004115 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004076726 | Date: | 10.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1597418 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1597418 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/46 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
D01F6/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYPROPYLENFASERN | [2005/47] | English: | POLYPROPYLENE FIBRES | [2005/47] | French: | FIBRES DE POLYPROPYLENE | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 23.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.12.2008 | BE | 17.12.2008 | CY | 17.12.2008 | EE | 17.12.2008 | FI | 17.12.2008 | NL | 17.12.2008 | RO | 17.12.2008 | SI | 17.12.2008 | SK | 17.12.2008 | TR | 17.12.2008 | IE | 10.02.2009 | LU | 10.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | BG | 17.03.2009 | SE | 17.03.2009 | GR | 18.03.2009 | ES | 28.03.2009 | PT | 18.05.2009 | HU | 18.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.02.2009 | ||
LU | 10.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
HU | 18.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.02.2009 | ||
LU | 10.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 10.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 17.12.2008 | |
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0552810 (HIMONT INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * example 8 *; | [A]EP0632147 (HIMONT INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 27 - line 50 * * example 3 *; | [A]EP0987287 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 3, line 15 - line 40 * * page 17, line 9 - line 16 * * example - *; | [A]EP1041111 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * page 3, line 5 - line 28 ** example - *; | [AD]US6218010 (GEORGELLIS GEORGE BYRON [US], et al) [AD] 1-9 * column 3, line 12 - line 16 * * column 5, line 44 - line 67 * * example - * |