Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1597418 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2008 | B1 | EP1597418 | 23.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP01210 | 10.02.2004 | EP03004115 | 26.02.2003 | EP04709618 | 10.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004018464D1 | 29.01.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP01210 | 10.02.2004 | EP03004115 | 26.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1597418T | 30.03.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2004EP01210 | 10.02.2004 | EP03004115 | 26.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004076726 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03004115 | 26.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1452630 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03004115 | 26.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE417948T | 15.01.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP03004115 | 26.02.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL378558 | 02.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03004115 | 26.02.2003 |