EP1604748 - METHOD OF TREATING WASTE GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8-, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8-, Honcho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyoshi, Hiroshi Nat.Inst.of Adv Ind. Sce Kansai Ctr, 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-Chome Ikeda-shi, Osaka 5638577 / JP | 02 /
Akai, Tomoko Nat. Inst. of Adv. Sce & Tech. Kansai Ctr., 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ideka-shi, Osaka 5638577 / JP | 03 /
Chen, Danping Nat. Inst. of Adv. Sce & Tech. Kansai Ctr., 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ideka-shi, Osaka 5638577 / JP | [2006/21] |
Former [2006/17] | 01 /
MIYOSHI, Hiroshi Nat.Inst.of Adv Ind. Sce Kansai Ctr, 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-Chome Ikeda-shi, Osaka 5638577 / JP | ||
02 /
AKAI, Tomoko Nat. Inst. of Adv. Sce & Tech. Kansai Ctr., 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ideka-shi, Osaka 5638577 / JP | |||
03 /
CHEN, Danping Nat. Inst. of Adv. Sce & Tech. Kansai Ctr., 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ideka-shi, Osaka 5638577 / JP | |||
Former [2005/50] | 01 /
MIYOSHI, H., Nat.Inst.of Adv Ind. Sce and Tech. Kansai Ctr, 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-Chome Ikeda-sh / JP | ||
02 /
AKAI, T., Nat. Inst. of Adv. Sce & Tech. Kansai Ctr., 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ideka-sh / JP | |||
03 /
CHEN, D., Nat. Inst. of Adv. Sce & Tech. Kansai Ctr., 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ideka-sh / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04710481.5 | 12.02.2004 | [2005/50] | WO2004JP01483 | Priority number, date | JP20030037163 | 14.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003037163 | [2005/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004071685 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604748 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, C04B18/16 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
C04B20/06 (EP,US);
C04B14/24 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B20/06, C04B14/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/24] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABFALLGLAS | [2005/50] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING WASTE GLASS | [2005/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE DEBRIS DE VERRE | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2005 | Translation filed | 04.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3912481 (BARTHOLOMEW ROGER F, et al) [A] 1,3-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US3940277 (PIERSON JOSEPH E, et al) [A] 1,3-7* the whole document *; | [XY]US3948629 (BARTHOLOMEW ROGER F, et al) [X] 1,3,5,7 * column 3, line 49 - column 5, line 15 * * column 6, lines 38-63 * [Y] 6; | [Y]US4162166 (WALLS-MUYCELO JOSE [MX]) [Y] 6 * column 7, line 59 - column 8, line 45 * | International search | [X]US4140510 (SCHOLZE HORST, et al); | [XP]JP2003095763 (TECHNO NETWORK SHIKOKU CO LTD) | [X] - MATAMOROS VELOZA Z. ET AL, "Recycling waste glasses by means of the hydrothermal hot pressing method", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE LETTERS, (1999), vol. 18, no. 22, pages 1811 - 1813, XP000869124 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1006622616850 | [X] - SIGOLI F.A. ET AL, "Phase separation in pyrex glass by hydrothermal treatment: evidence from micro-Raman spectroscopy", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, (2001), vol. 284, pages 49 - 54, XP004249937 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-3093(01)00378-7 |