EP1594429 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR APPLYING ELASTIC ELEMENTS TO A MATERIAL WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [2005/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÄRPENBERG, Christian Ljunglidsvägen 23 S-438 36 Landvetter / SE | 02 /
HENRIKSSON, Kenneth Eklanda Hage 57 S-431 39 Mölndal / SE | 03 /
NORDER, Anders Espas Torpväg 4 S-437 34 Lindome / SE | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Andersson, Per Rune Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Andersson, Per Rune Albihns Göteborg AB Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 04710573.9 | 12.02.2004 | [2005/46] | WO2004SE00176 | Priority number, date | SE20030000476 | 21.02.2003 Original published format: SE 0300476 | [2005/46] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004073568 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1594429 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, A61F13/64, A61F13/56 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
A61F13/15593 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR APPLIKATION VON ELASTISCHEN ELEMENTEN AUF EINER MATERIALBAHN | [2005/46] | English: | ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR APPLYING ELASTIC ELEMENTS TO A MATERIAL WEB | [2005/46] | French: | ENSEMBLE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'APPLIQUER DES ELEMENTS ELASTIQUES SUR UNE BANDE DE MATIERE | [2005/46] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2004 | Translation filed | 10.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 24.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 09.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0396800 ; | [A]US4239578 ; | [AP]US2003089447 ; | [AP]US2003111162 |