EP1599902 - FLIP-CHIP COMPONENT PACKAGING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/48] | FLIP-CHIP COMPONENT PACKAGING PROCESS AND FLIP-CHIP COMPONENT | ||
[2014/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [2014/30] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Medtronic Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE, LC 340 Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOONE, Mark, R. 202 E. Avenida Sierra Madre Gilbert, AZ 85296 / US | 02 /
FENNER, Andreas, A. 877 East Nolan Place Chandler, AZ 85249 / US | 03 /
MILLA, Juan, G. 3429 East Jasmine Circle Mesa, AZ 85213 / US | 04 /
LARSON, Lary, R. 10132 East Daybreak Place Gold Canyon, AZ 85218 / US | [2006/01] |
Former [2005/48] | 01 /
BOONE, Mark, R. 518 San Remo Street Gilbert, AZ 85233 / US | ||
02 /
FENNER, Andreas, A. 877 East Nolan Place Chandler, AZ 85249 / US | |||
03 /
MILLA, Juan, G. 3429 East Jasmine Circle Mesa, AZ 85213 / US | |||
04 /
LARSON, Lary, R. 10132 East Daybreak Place Gold Canyon, AZ 85218 / US | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2014/30] |
Former [2005/48] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04710614.1 | 12.02.2004 | [2005/48] | WO2004US04040 | Priority number, date | US20030365765 | 13.02.2003 Original published format: US 365765 | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004075294 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1599902 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1599902 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/552, H01L23/58, H01L21/56, // H01L29/06 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
H01L23/552 (EP,US);
H01L23/585 (EP,US);
H01L29/0619 (EP,US);
H01L21/563 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83102 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92125 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1301 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/0401 (US,EP);
H01L2924/1301, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1305, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/48] | H01L23/552, H01L23/58, H01L21/56 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL, SE [2006/22] |
Former [2005/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSMETHODE EINES FLIP-CHIP BAUELEMENTS | [2014/09] | English: | FLIP-CHIP COMPONENT PACKAGING PROCESS | [2014/09] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE COMPOSANT RETOURNE | [2014/09] |
Former [2005/48] | FLIP-CHIP BAUELEMENT UND SEINE VERPACKUNGSMETHODE | ||
Former [2005/48] | FLIP-CHIP COMPONENT PACKAGING PROCESS AND FLIP-CHIP COMPONENT | ||
Former [2005/48] | PROCEDE DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE COMPOSANT RETOURNE ET COMPOSANT RETOURNE | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 01.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 23.07.2014 | SE | 23.07.2014 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | [2015/47] |
Former [2015/12] | NL | 23.07.2014 | |
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | SE | 23.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3763550 (OAKES J) [A] 1-10 * column 1, lines 15-48 * * column 5, line 35 - column 7, line 7; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0453424 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 51 * * column 3, line 31 - column 5, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5087577 (STRACK HELMUT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 10; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5686754 (CHOI CHONGWOOK CHRIS [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 27 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 63; figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE10060828 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] ** paragraphs [0024] - [0038]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US6420208 (POZDER SCOTT K [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 10 - column 2, line 26 * * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 63; figures 1-9 * |