EP1601815 - WEAR RESISTANT COATINGS TO REDUCE ICE ADHESION ON AIR FOILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE TIMKEN COMPANY 1835 Dueber Avenue, S.W. Canton, OH 44706-0930 / US | [2005/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOLL, Gary L. 6516 Pebble Creek Canton, OH 44718-1283 / US | 02 /
EVANS, Ryan D. 5065 Techwood North Canton, OH 44720-8427 / US | 03 /
COOKE, Elizabeth P. 836 South Locust Street Canal Fulton, OH 44614-1206 / US | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Marles, Alan David, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Marles, Alan David, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04710627.3 | 12.02.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004US04179 | Priority number, date | US20030451439P | 03.03.2003 Original published format: US 451439 P | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004078873 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1601815 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/00, B64D15/00 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
C23C14/0605 (EP,US);
B64D15/00 (EP,US);
C23C16/0272 (EP,US);
C23C16/26 (EP,US);
C23C16/30 (EP,US);
C23C28/044 (EP,US);
C23C28/046 (EP,US);
C23C28/048 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/24] |
Former [2005/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABNUTZUNGSBESTÄNDIGE BESCHICHTUNGEN ZUR VERMINDERUNG DER EISANHAFTUNG AUF FLÄCHEN AN LUFTFAHRZEUGEN | [2005/49] | English: | WEAR RESISTANT COATINGS TO REDUCE ICE ADHESION ON AIR FOILS | [2005/49] | French: | REVETEMENTS RESISTANTS A L'USURE POUR LA REDUCTION D'ADHERENCE SUR DES SURFACES AERODYNAMIQUES | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 29.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 12.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002192371 (VEERASAMY VIJAYEN S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0050] - [0052] - [0055] , [0098]; figures 1,2a,2b,3,8,9; table 3 *; | [X]US6153304 (SMITH JOHN RALPH [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6 * column 1, lines 17-39 * * column 2, lines 40-67 * * column 8, lines 8-12; example 1; claims 1,2 *; | [X]DE19745621 (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AIRBUS [DE]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * | [X] - GRISCHKE M ET AL, "APPLICATION-ORIENTED MODIFICATIONS OF DEPOSITION PROCESSES FOR DIAMOND-LIKE-CARBON-BASED COATINGS", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19951001), vol. 74/75, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 739 - 745, XP000617427 [X] 1-6 * page 740, column R, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 741, column R, paragraph 2 - page 742, column L, paragraph 1; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0257-8972(94)08201-4 |