EP1592827 - DEVICE COMPRISING A MICROWAVE RESONATOR FOR OR ON A SPINNER PREPARATION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rieter Ingolstadt GmbH Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [2008/21] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Rieter Ingolstadt Spinnereimaschinenbau AG Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÖHLER, Wolfgang Jurastrasse 2 85101 Lenting / DE | 02 /
CHERIF, Chokri Merseburgerstr. 2 01309 Dresden / DE | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/45] | 01 /
GÖHLER, Wolfgang Jurastrasse 2 85101 Lenting / DE | ||
02 /
CHERIF, Chokri Herkommerstrasse 3 85057 Ingolstadt / DE | Representative(s) | Schlief, Thomas P. Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Schlief, Thomas P. Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 04710843.6 | 13.02.2004 | [2005/45] | WO2004EP01351 | Priority number, date | DE2003106209 | 13.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10306209 | [2005/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004072337 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1592827 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1592827 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D01G31/00, D01H13/32 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
D01G31/006 (EP,US);
D01H13/32 (EP,US);
G01N33/365 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM MIKROWELLENRESONATOR FÜR EINE ODER AN EINER SPINNEREIVORBEREITUNGSMASCHINE | [2005/45] | English: | DEVICE COMPRISING A MICROWAVE RESONATOR FOR OR ON A SPINNER PREPARATION MACHINE | [2005/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF A RESONATEUR MICRO-ONDES POUR OU SUR UNE MACHINE DE PREPARATION A LA FILATURE | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 25.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.04.2008 | CZ | 16.04.2008 | DK | 16.04.2008 | EE | 16.04.2008 | FI | 16.04.2008 | IE | 16.04.2008 | NL | 16.04.2008 | RO | 16.04.2008 | SI | 16.04.2008 | SK | 16.04.2008 | TR | 16.04.2008 | BG | 16.07.2008 | SE | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | ES | 27.07.2008 | PT | 16.09.2008 | HU | 17.10.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
GR | 17.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
GR | 17.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 16.04.2008 | |
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 16.04.2008 | |
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 16.04.2008 | |
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 16.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5103180 (LAHITTE PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1,39* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO0012974 (MALCAM LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1,39 * figure 7; claims 11,13,20 *; | [A]US6417676 (SCHROEDER DIERK [DE], et al) [A] 14-26,29-38 * column 4, line 61 - column 6, line 13; figure 1 *; | [PX]EP1316630 (TEWS ELEKTRONIK DIPL ING MANFR [DE]) [PX] 1-5,39 * claims 1,5 *; | [PX]US2003150266 (DAMMIG JOACHIM [DE], et al) [PX] 1-4,27,28,39 * claims 1,2,38,40-42,57 * |