EP1602751 - METHOD FOR PREPARING BORATE-BASED CRYSTAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/49] | METHOD FOR PREPARING BORATE-BASED CRYSTAL AND LASER OSCILLATION APPARATUS | ||
[2012/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [2012/40] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Takatomo A-9-310, 2-8, Yamada-nishi Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0824 / JP | 02 /
MORI, Yusuke 16-9, Kisaichi 8-chome Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0033 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIMURA, Masashi 1309, 2-1, Sakasegawa 1-chome Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-0035 / JP | 04 /
NISHIOKA, Muneyuki 4-15, Kawaguchi-machi 2-chome Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi 740-0015 / JP | 05 /
FUKUMOTO, Satoru 559, Bessho, Bessho-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-0221 / JP | 06 /
MATSUI, Tomoyo 401, 2-17, Shibakoen 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-0011 / JP | 07 /
SAJI, Takashi 88-8-1, Nakahirabuki-cho Takefu-shi, Fukui 915-0856 / JP | [2012/40] |
Former [2005/49] | 01 /
SASAKI, Takatomo A-9-310, 2-8, Yamada-nishi Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0824 / JP | ||
02 /
MORI, Yusuke 16-9, Kisaichi 8-chome Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0033 / JP | |||
03 /
YOSHIMURA, Masashi 1309, 2-1, Sakasegawa, 1-chome Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665-0035 / JP | |||
04 /
NISHIOKA, Muneyuki 4-15, Kawaguchi-machi 2-chome Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi 740-0015 / JP | |||
05 /
FUKUMOTO, Satoru 559, Bessho, Bessho-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-0221 / JP | |||
06 /
MATSUI, Tomoyo 401, 2-17, Shibakoen 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-0011 / JP | |||
07 /
SAJI, Takashi 88-8-1, Nakahirabuki-cho Takefu-shi, Fukui 915-0856 / JP | Representative(s) | Calamita, Roberto Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Calamita, Roberto Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/49] | Calamita, Roberto Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04711015.0 | 13.02.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004JP01546 | Priority number, date | JP20030035778 | 13.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003035778 | JP20030109294 | 14.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003109294 | [2005/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004079060 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1602751 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1602751 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C30B35/00, C30B29/22, C01B35/12, C30B11/02 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
C30B35/007 (EP,US);
C01B35/12 (EP,US);
C30B11/02 (EP,US);
C30B29/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/49] | C30B29/22, C01B35/12 | Designated contracting states | DE [2006/22] |
Former [2005/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZUBEREITUNG VON AUF BORAT BASIERENDEM KRISTALL | [2012/16] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING BORATE-BASED CRYSTAL | [2012/16] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN CRISTAL A BASE DE BORATE | [2012/16] |
Former [2005/49] | VERFAHREN ZUR ZUBEREITUNG VON AUF BORAT BASIERENDEM KRISTALL UND LASERSCHWINGVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2005/49] | METHOD FOR PREPARING BORATE-BASED CRYSTAL AND LASER OSCILLATION APPARATUS | ||
Former [2005/49] | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN CRISTAL A BASE DE BORATE ET APPAREIL D'OSCILLATION LASER | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2005 | Translation filed | 13.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 08.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH05270989 (JAPAN ENERGY CORP) [Y] 1-3 * abstract *; | [YX] - SASAKI T ET AL, "Recent development of nonlinear optical borate crystals: key materials for generation of visible and UV light", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING R: REPORTS, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (20001101), vol. 30, no. 1-2, ISSN 0927-796X, pages 1 - 54, XP004218397 [Y] 1-3 * paragraph [2.3.1] * * the whole document * [X] 4-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-796X(00)00025-5 | [A] - KAMIMURA T ET AL, "INFLUENCE OF CRYSTALLINITY ON THE BULK LASER-INDUCED DAMAGE THRESHOLD AND ABSORPTION OF LASER LIGHT IN CSLIB6O10 CRYSTALS", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS, TOKYO,JP, (20010201), vol. 40, no. 2A, PART 02, ISSN 0021-4922, pages L111 - L113, XP001025282 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.40.L111 | [A] - NAKAI K ET AL, "Growth of radiation-resistant CsLiB6O10 crystal", LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS, 1999. CLEO/PACIFIC RIM '99. THE PACIFIC RIM CONFERENCE ON SEOUL, SOUTH KOREA 30 AUG.-3 SEPT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990830), vol. 3, ISBN 978-0-7803-5661-0, pages 967 - 968, XP010364642 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CLEOPR.1999.817924 | International search | [X]JPH0354112 (NEC CORP); | [X]JPH05270989 ; | [X]JPH0789796 (IBIDEN CO LTD); | [A]JPH09278593 (NIPPON MEKTRON KK); | [A]JP2002068891 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al) |