EP1593057 - BROWSER PROGRAM FOR PERFORMING TABLE-LAYOUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACCESS CO., LTD. 8-16, Sarugakucho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0064 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states ACCESS CO., LTD. 8-16, Sarugakucho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0064 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDO, Masaya, c/o Access Co., Ltd. 2-8-16, Sarugaku-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1010064 / JP | 02 /
UEMATSU, Michimasa, c/o Access Co., Ltd. 2-8-16,S arugaku-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1010064 / JP | [2011/39] |
Former [2005/45] | 01 /
ENDO, Masaya, c/o Access Co., Ltd. 2-8-16, Sarugaku-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1010064 / JP | ||
02 /
UEMATSU, Michimasa, c/o Access Co., Ltd. 2-8-16,S arugaku-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1010064 / JP | Representative(s) | Ablett, Graham Keith Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London, W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Ablett, Graham Keith Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London, W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/03] | Ablett, Graham Keith Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London, W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/49] | Ablett, Graham Keith Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1M 1FD / GB | ||
Former [2005/45] | Ablett, Graham Keith Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04711041.6 | 13.02.2004 | [2005/45] | WO2004JP01606 | Priority number, date | JP20030036279 | 14.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003036279 | [2005/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004072867 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1593057 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1593057 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
G06F16/9577 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Title | German: | BROWSER-PROGRAMM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES TABELLEN-LAYOUT | [2005/45] | English: | BROWSER PROGRAM FOR PERFORMING TABLE-LAYOUT | [2005/45] | French: | PROGRAMME DE NAVIGATEUR PERMETTANT DE DISPOSER UNE TABLE | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.03.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2004 | AT | 28.09.2011 | BE | 28.09.2011 | CY | 28.09.2011 | CZ | 28.09.2011 | DK | 28.09.2011 | EE | 28.09.2011 | FI | 28.09.2011 | IT | 28.09.2011 | NL | 28.09.2011 | RO | 28.09.2011 | SE | 28.09.2011 | SI | 28.09.2011 | SK | 28.09.2011 | TR | 28.09.2011 | BG | 28.12.2011 | GR | 29.12.2011 | ES | 08.01.2012 | PT | 30.01.2012 | IE | 13.02.2012 | LU | 13.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | FR | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
IE | 13.02.2012 | ||
LU | 13.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
IE | 13.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
IE | 13.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
IE | 13.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
IE | 13.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
FR | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 28.09.2011 | |
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 28.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0949571 (XEROX CORP [US]) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0011] - [0017]; figures 2,10,13,14 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] * * paragraphs [0049] , [0050] * * paragraphs [0120] - [0125] *; | [A]US2001011364 (STOUB EVERETT W [US]) [A] 2* paragraph [0067] *; | [I]WO0157611 (BCL COMPUTERS INC [US]) [I] 1-18 * page 15, line 24 - page 17, line 14; figures 4,6,7; claims 1,3,5,8-11 * * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 25 *; | [XI]WO0165354 (CELLTREX LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,3,9,16,17 * page 4, lines 11-15; claim 1 * * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 22 * * page 20, line 5 - page 21, line 6 * * the whole document * [I] 2,4-8,10-15,18; | [I]WO02087135 (NOVARRA INC [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 24 * * page 33, lines 14-23 * * page 40, lines 1-17 * * page 48, lines 11-18 * | by applicant | WO0157611 | WO02087135 |