EP1594601 - PAPER PRODUCTS SOFTENING COMPOSITONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUNTSMAN PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION 7114 North Lamar Boulevard Austin Texas 78752 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states HUNTSMAN PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION 7114 North Lamar Boulevard Austin Texas 78752 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, Duy, T. 12133 Laguna Terrace Drive Houston, TX 77041 / US | 02 /
ASHRAWI, Samir, S. 70 South Dove Trace Circle The Woodlands, TX 77382 / US | [2007/09] |
Former [2007/02] | 01 /
NGUYEN, Duy, T. 12133 Laguna Terrace Drive Houston, TX 77041 / US | ||
02 /
ASHRAWI, Samir, S. 13228 Darwin Lane Austin, TX 78729 / US | |||
Former [2005/46] | 01 /
NGUYEN, Duy, T. 15702 Foxboro Court Austin, TX 78717 / US | ||
02 /
ASHRAWI, Samir, S. 13228 Darwin Lane Austin, TX 78729 / US | Representative(s) | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04711213.1 | 13.02.2004 | [2005/46] | WO2004US04337 | Priority number, date | US20030369263 | 18.02.2003 Original published format: US 369263 | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004074572 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1594601 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01F17/04, // D21H21/24 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
C07C233/35 (EP,US);
D21H21/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/46] | B01F17/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEICHMACHERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR PAPIERPRODUKTE | [2005/46] | English: | PAPER PRODUCTS SOFTENING COMPOSITONS | [2005/46] | French: | COMPOSTIONS ADOUCISSANTES POUR DES PRODUITS EN PAPIER | [2005/46] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/04] | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS55336 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800306), vol. 004, no. 026, Database accession no. (C - 001), & JP55000336 A 19800105 (KAWAKEN FINE CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1,3 * column A * | International search | [X]US4941983 (COATES JACQUELINE A [GB], et al); | [Y]US5914310 (LI JI [US], et al); | [A]US3091522 (HEMWALL JOHN B) | [X] - "4,7,10,13-Tetraazahentriacont-22-enoic acid....", REGISTRY, (20021018), XP002903168 |