EP1714508 - A METHOD FOR CONFIGURING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDERSEN, Claus Nordmarksvænge 44 DK-2625 Vallensbæk / DK | 02 /
HANSEN, Jacob Indre Vordingborgvej 18 DK-4700 Næstved / DK | [2016/18] |
Former [2006/43] | 01 /
PEDERSEN, Claus Nordmarksv nge 44 DK-2625 Vallensb k / DK | ||
02 /
HANSEN, Jacob Indre Vordingborgvej 18 DK-4700 N stved / DK | Representative(s) | Higgin, Paul Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2016/18] |
Former [2006/43] | Higgin, Paul Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04711313.9 | 14.02.2004 | [2006/43] | WO2004IB00811 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005086511 | Date: | 15.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1714508 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1714508 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/24, // H04W80/00 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
H04W8/245 (EP,US);
H04L67/34 (EP,US);
H04W8/22 (EP,US);
H04W80/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/43] | H04Q7/32, G09G5/00, G06F15/167 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2006/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KONFIGURIEREN EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN EINRICHTUNG | [2006/43] | English: | A METHOD FOR CONFIGURING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2006/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONFIGURATION D'UN DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE | [2006/43] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.02.2004 | AT | 04.05.2016 | BE | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | ES | 04.05.2016 | FI | 04.05.2016 | IT | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | NL | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | SE | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | TR | 04.05.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 14.02.2004 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 14.02.2004 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.02.2004 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
NL | 04.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6088795 (VORBACH MARTIN [DE], et al); | [Y]WO0213413 (STATSIGNAL SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [X]US2003065738 (YANG VICTOR SHIANG [TW], et al); | [X]US2003080996 (LAVIN DANIEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2003172139 (SRINIVASAN VENKATACHARY [US], et al) | by applicant | US6088795 | WO0213413 | US2003065738 | US2003080996 | US2003172139 |