EP1592975 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TESTING INTEGRATED CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANTEST CORPORATION 1-32-1, Asahi-cho Nerima-ku Tokyo 179-0071 / JP | [2008/13] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states ADVANTEST CORPORATION 1-32-1, Asahi-cho Nerima-ku Tokyo 179-0071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRAMANICK, Ankan, c/o Advantest Corporation 1-32-1, Asahi-cho, Nerima-ku Tokyo 1790071 / JP | 02 /
ELSTON, Mark, c/o Advantest Corporation 1-32-1, Asahi-cho, Nerima-ku Tokyo 1790071 / JP | 03 /
CHEN, Leon, c/o Advantest Corporation 1-32-1, Asahi-cho, Nerima-ku Tokyo 1790071 / JP | 04 /
SAUER, Robert, c/o Advantest Corporation 1-32-1, Asahi-cho, Nerima-ku Tokyo 1790071 / JP | [2005/45] | Representative(s) | Bergmann, Jürgen Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Bergmann, Jürgen Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 04711445.9 | 16.02.2004 | [2005/45] | WO2004JP01648 | Priority number, date | US20030447839P | 14.02.2003 Original published format: US 447839 P | US20030449622P | 24.02.2003 Original published format: US 449622 P | [2007/29] |
Former [2005/45] | US20030447839P | 14.02.2003 | |
US20030449622P | 24.02.2003 | ||
US20030403817 | 31.03.2003 | ||
US20030404002 | 31.03.2003 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004072669 | Date: | 26.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1592975 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1592975 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/319 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
G01R31/31907 (EP);
G01R31/26 (KR);
G01R31/318307 (EP);
G01R31/318342 (EP);
H01L22/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PRÜFEN INTEGRIERTER SCHALTUNGEN | [2007/19] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TESTING INTEGRATED CIRCUITS | [2005/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE SOUMETTRE DES CIRCUITS INTEGRES A UN ESSAI | [2005/45] |
Former [2005/45] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PR FEN INTEGRIERTER SCHALTUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 29.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 09.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0003, 0004 | 30.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.2008 | BE | 26.03.2008 | CY | 26.03.2008 | CZ | 26.03.2008 | DK | 26.03.2008 | EE | 26.03.2008 | FI | 26.03.2008 | IT | 26.03.2008 | NL | 26.03.2008 | RO | 26.03.2008 | SI | 26.03.2008 | SK | 26.03.2008 | TR | 26.03.2008 | BG | 26.06.2008 | SE | 26.06.2008 | GR | 27.06.2008 | ES | 07.07.2008 | PT | 01.09.2008 | HU | 27.09.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
GR | 27.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
GR | 27.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
IT | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0388107 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * column A; figures 2-12 * * column 5, lines 12-17 * * column 9, lines 2-13 *[A] 2-24; | [XY]US6028439 (ARKIN BRIAN J [US], et al) [X] 1-8,15-19,21-23 * column A; figures 1-9; claims 1-13 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 42 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 8 * * column 4, lines 50-53 * * column 7, line 62 - column 8, line 13 * [Y] 9-14,20,24; | [XY]US2002073375 (HOLLANDER YOAV [IL]) [X] 1 * column A; figures 1-8; claims 1-8 * * page 3, paragraphs 40-51 * * page 4, paragraph 64 * * page 7, paragraphs 134-139 * [Y] 9-14,20,24 |