EP1597555 - ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATING THE HEIGHT OF THE CENTRE OF GRAVITY OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB (publ) 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states Scania CV AB (publ) Fack 151 87 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETTERSSON, Niklas Högalidsgatan 50 A, 5tr S-117 30 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
VAGSTEDT, Nils-Gunnar Margaretabacken 3 S-187 74 Täby / SE | 03 /
LINDQVIST, Kristian Anders Lundströms gata 4 S-169 73 Solna / SE | [2005/47] | Application number, filing date | 04711792.4 | 17.02.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004SE00202 | Priority number, date | SE20030000436 | 18.02.2003 Original published format: SE 0300436 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004074804 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1597555 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1597555 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01M1/12, B62D37/00 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
G01M1/122 (EP);
B62D37/00 (EP);
B60G2400/63 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DER HÖHE DES SCHWERPUNKTS EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2005/47] | English: | ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR ESTIMATING THE HEIGHT OF THE CENTRE OF GRAVITY OF A VEHICLE | [2005/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR ESTIMER LA HAUTEUR DU CENTRE DE GRAVITE D'UN VEHICULE | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 19.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 27.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.01.2008 | BE | 23.01.2008 | CH | 23.01.2008 | CY | 23.01.2008 | CZ | 23.01.2008 | DK | 23.01.2008 | EE | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | IT | 23.01.2008 | LI | 23.01.2008 | RO | 23.01.2008 | SI | 23.01.2008 | SK | 23.01.2008 | TR | 23.01.2008 | LU | 17.02.2008 | IE | 18.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | BG | 23.04.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | GR | 24.04.2008 | ES | 04.05.2008 | PT | 23.06.2008 | HU | 24.07.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
TR | 23.01.2008 | ||
LU | 17.02.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
HU | 24.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
LU | 17.02.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
HU | 24.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
LU | 17.02.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IT | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CY | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
BE | 23.01.2008 | ||
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 23.01.2008 | |
CH | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CH | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 23.01.2008 | |
LI | 23.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5825284 (DUNWOODY ANDREW B [CA], et al); | [A]DE19918525 (HINO MOTORS LTD [JP]); | [X]US6044319 (ROSENDAHL HARTMUT [DE], et al); | [A]US6370938 (LEIMBACH KLAUS-DIETER [DE], et al); | [A]US6424907 (RIETH PETER [DE], et al) |