EP1645658 - ELECTROLESS GOLD PLATING SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corporation 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2014/11] |
Former [2014/05] | For all designated states Nippon Mining Holdings, Inc. 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Nippon Mining & Metals Co., Ltd. 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8407 / JP | ||
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states Nikko Materials Company, Limited 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIBA, Akihiro, Nikko Materials Co., Ltd. Isohara Plant, 187-4, Usuba, Hanakawa-cho Kitaibaraki-shi, Ibaraki 3191535 / JP | 02 /
HISUMI, Yoshiyuki, Nikko Materials Co. Ltd. Isohara Plant, 187-4, Usuba, Hanakawa-cho Kitaibaraki-shi, Ibaraki 3191535 / JP | 03 /
KAWAMURA, Kazumi, Nikko Materials Co., Ltd. Isohara Plant, 187-4, Usuba, Hanakawa-cho Kitaibaraki-shi, Ibaraki 3191535 / JP | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair, et al Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx, et al Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04712169.4 | 18.02.2004 | [2006/15] | WO2004JP01784 | Priority number, date | JP20030160974 | 05.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003160974 | [2006/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004108987 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1645658 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/42, C23C18/16 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
C23C18/42 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/15] | C23C18/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/37] |
Former [2006/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÖSUNG ZUR STROMLOSEN VERGOLDUNG | [2006/15] | English: | ELECTROLESS GOLD PLATING SOLUTION | [2006/15] | French: | SOLUTION DE PLACAGE D'OR AUTOCATALYTIQUE | [2006/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2005 | Translation filed | 20.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 01.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/02] | 08.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2803147 (HERAEUS GMBH W C) [X] 1-4 * examples 1-7 *; | [X]EP0219788 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4* examples 1-3 *; | [X]US5470381 (KATO MASARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * examples 1-26 *; | [X]US5935306 (REED ALLAN H [US]) [X] 1-4 * examples 1-6 * | International search | [X]JP2002273239 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JPH10130855 (DAIWA KASEI KENKYUSHO, et al) |