EP1635645 - METHOD OF FREEZING PRAWN- OR LOBSTER-TYPE SEAFOOD PRODUCTS AND MOULDING DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states France Agro Industries Parc d'Activité de la Bouvre, 12 Rue Gutenberg 44340 Bouguenais / FR | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESNARDEAU, Guy Route Digue, Quest Ankadimbahoaka BP 4395 Antananarive 101 / MG | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Catherine, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, Rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Catherine, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04713105.7 | 20.02.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004FR50072 | Priority number, date | FR20030002190 | 21.02.2003 Original published format: FR 0302190 | [2006/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004075637 | Date: | 10.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1635645 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1635645 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A23B4/06, A23L3/36 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
A23B4/068 (EP);
A23L17/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEFRIERVERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MEERESPRODUKTEN WIE GARNELEN ODER LANGUSTEN, UND FORMVORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2006/12] | English: | METHOD OF FREEZING PRAWN- OR LOBSTER-TYPE SEAFOOD PRODUCTS AND MOULDING DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | [2006/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONGELATION DE PRODUITS DE LA MER, GENRE CREVETTES OU LANGOUSTINES, ET DISPOSITIF DE MOULAGE POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 09.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.01.2006 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | 09.01.2006 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.01.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   09.01.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.02.2009 | CY | 11.02.2009 | CZ | 11.02.2009 | DK | 11.02.2009 | EE | 11.02.2009 | FI | 11.02.2009 | IE | 11.02.2009 | IT | 11.02.2009 | NL | 11.02.2009 | RO | 11.02.2009 | SI | 11.02.2009 | SK | 11.02.2009 | TR | 11.02.2009 | LU | 20.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | BG | 11.05.2009 | GB | 11.05.2009 | SE | 11.05.2009 | GR | 12.05.2009 | ES | 22.05.2009 | PT | 13.07.2009 | HU | 12.08.2009 | DE | 01.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
LU | 20.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GB | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
HU | 12.08.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
LU | 20.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GB | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
IT | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GB | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GB | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GB | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 11.02.2009 | |
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | NL | 11.02.2009 | |
ES | 22.05.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH03262438 ; | [X]US1388296 (PETERSEN PAUL W) [X] 1-3,5,8 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 116; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US3838955 (DUBBELD W) [X] 5,8 * figure - *; | [X]US4330957 (DAVIS GARY L) [X] 5,8 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [X]CA1151369 (NICKERSON H B & SONS LIMITED) [X] 1 * page 5, line 6 - line 13; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4948620 (CLAIROUIN NOEL [FR], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 4 - line 24; figure - *; | [X]FR2760601 (GROUPE ADRIEN [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9 * page 2, line 30 - line 33 * * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 6 * * figures 1B,1D; claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920219), vol. 016, no. 066, Database accession no. (C - 0912), & JP03262438 A 19911122 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] * abstract * |