EP1594987 - NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCING METHODS, KITS AND REAGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GeneForm Technologies Limited Unit G, Twydall Enterprises Centre 256 Twydall Lane Gillingham Kent ME8 6XX / GB | [2006/41] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states Hoser, Mark J. 106 Pierremont Avenue, Broadstairs Kent CT10 1NT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSER, Mark J. 106 Pierremont Avenue Broadstairs, Kent CT10 1NT / GB | [2008/29] |
Former [2005/46] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04713125.5 | 20.02.2004 | [2005/46] | WO2004GB00709 | Priority number, date | GB20030003964 | 21.02.2003 Original published format: GB 0303964 | GB20030005525 | 11.03.2003 Original published format: GB 0305525 | GB20030006119 | 18.03.2003 Original published format: GB 0306119 | GB20030007515 | 01.04.2003 Original published format: GB 0307515 | GB20030010294 | 03.05.2003 Original published format: GB 0310294 | GB20030013689 | 13.06.2003 Original published format: GB 0313689 | GB20030020157 | 28.08.2003 Original published format: GB 0320157 | GB20030022245 | 23.09.2003 Original published format: GB 0322245 | GB20030025657 | 04.11.2003 Original published format: GB 0325657 | GB20030029053 | 16.12.2003 Original published format: GB 0329053 | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004074503 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1594987 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1594987 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H19/00 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6869 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
C07H19/00 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6869, C12Q2563/173, C12Q2527/127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, KITS UND REAGENZIEN ZUR NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZIERUNG | [2005/46] | English: | NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCING METHODS, KITS AND REAGENTS | [2005/46] | French: | METHODES, KITS ET REACTIFS POUR LE SEQUEN AGE D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES | [2005/46] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 04.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 13.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 13.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 13.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | 26.10.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 26.10.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.11.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 29.02.2008 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.2008 | 28.02.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   07.04.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.05.2009 | BE | 27.05.2009 | CY | 27.05.2009 | CZ | 27.05.2009 | DK | 27.05.2009 | EE | 27.05.2009 | FI | 27.05.2009 | IT | 27.05.2009 | RO | 27.05.2009 | SI | 27.05.2009 | SK | 27.05.2009 | TR | 27.05.2009 | BG | 27.08.2009 | GR | 28.08.2009 | ES | 07.09.2009 | PT | 27.09.2009 | HU | 28.11.2009 | IE | 20.02.2010 | LU | 20.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CY | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IT | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
HU | 28.11.2009 | ||
IE | 20.02.2010 | ||
LU | 20.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CY | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IT | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
HU | 28.11.2009 | ||
IE | 20.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CY | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IT | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
IE | 20.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IT | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
IE | 20.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
IE | 20.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
BE | 27.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
CZ | 27.05.2009 | ||
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
ES | 07.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 27.05.2009 | |
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9914226 (EXIQON A S [DK], et al) [X] 1-12,14-28 * examples 140,141; claims 60-66,100 *; | [A]WO0050172 (CALIPER TECHN CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-28* the whole document *; | [X]WO0056748 (EXIQON A S [DK], et al) [X] 1-28 * page 40, line 22 - line 26; claims 31,47 *; | [X]US6147199 (SEELA FRANK [DE], et al) [X] 1-12,14-28 * claims 1-4 *; | [X]US2002160972 (COOK PHILLIP DAN [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * claims 1-5 *; | [PX]WO03051901 (UNEST AS [DK], et al) [PX] 1-28 * the whole document * | Examination | WO0070073 |