EP1597130 - PORTABLE COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE INTEGRATING REMOTE CONTROL OF RAIL TRACK SWITCHES AND MOVEMENT OF A LOCOMOTIVE IN A TRAIN YARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2009/17] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORNICK, David 6951 Mulberry Court Melbourne, FL 32940 / US | 02 /
FOY, Robert, James 4169 Mockingbird Drive Melbourne, FL 32934 / US | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation, General Electric International, Inc., 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04713353.3 | 20.02.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004US05034 | Priority number, date | US20030448701P | 20.02.2003 Original published format: US 448701 P | US20030528862P | 11.12.2003 Original published format: US 528862 P | US20040759319 | 16.01.2004 Original published format: US 759319 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004074068 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1597130 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1597130 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B61L3/12, B61L17/00, B61L7/06 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
B61L7/06 (EP,US);
B61L17/00 (EP,US);
B61L3/127 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/47] | B61L27/00, B61L3/12, B61L17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARES ENDGERÄT ZUR FERNSTEUERUNG VON WEICHEN UND LOKOMOTIVEN IN EINEM RANGIERBAHNHOF | [2005/47] | English: | PORTABLE COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE INTEGRATING REMOTE CONTROL OF RAIL TRACK SWITCHES AND MOVEMENT OF A LOCOMOTIVE IN A TRAIN YARD | [2005/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION PORTABLE POUVANT TELECOMMANDER DES AIGUILLAGES DE VOIES FERREES AINSI QUE LE DEPLACEMENT D'UNE LOCOMOTIVE DANS UNE GARE DE TRIAGE | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 27.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.04.2009 | BE | 22.04.2009 | CY | 22.04.2009 | CZ | 22.04.2009 | DK | 22.04.2009 | EE | 22.04.2009 | IT | 22.04.2009 | RO | 22.04.2009 | SI | 22.04.2009 | SK | 22.04.2009 | TR | 22.04.2009 | BG | 22.07.2009 | SE | 22.07.2009 | GR | 23.07.2009 | PT | 22.08.2009 | HU | 23.10.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CY | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
IT | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
HU | 23.10.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CY | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
IT | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
IT | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.07.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
BG | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
BE | 22.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SK | 22.04.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
CZ | 22.04.2009 | ||
DK | 22.04.2009 | ||
EE | 22.04.2009 | ||
RO | 22.04.2009 | ||
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
SI | 22.04.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
PT | 22.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 22.04.2009 | |
PT | 22.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2951452 (KARLET JOSEPH G) [A] 1-10 * column 2, lines 24-52 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9510439 (YOUNG NEIL P [US]) [A] 1-10* page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5437422 (NEWMAN GREOGORY D [GB]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 61 * * figure 6 *; | [A]US5685507 (HORST FOLKERT [CA], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 24 * * column 3, lines 9-54 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19743306 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 22 - column 5, line 39 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US6135396 (WHITFIELD RUSSELL U [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, lines 8-12 * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 3 * * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 36 * * column 8, lines 33-60 * * column 9, line 54 - column 10, line 7 * * figures 1-6 *; | [XA]DE19840715 (ABB DAIMLER BENZ TRANSP [DE]) [X] 8-10 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 24 * * figure 1 * [A] 1-7; | [X]US6445150 (TANNER CHRISTOPHER MARK [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 6 * * figures 2,3,13 *; | [A]DE10117387 (VERKEHRSBETR E PEINE SALZGITTE [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0054] - [0059] * * figures 1,2 *; | [XA] - DENNY J ET AL INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Communications-based yard control (CB:YC DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RRCON.2000.869992 |