EP1601246 - PET CHEWS AND METHODS OF MAKING PET CHEWS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Hartz Mountain Corporation 400 Plaza Drive Secaucus, NJ 07094-3688 / US | [2005/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIA, Tiandong 6 Bates Court Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | 02 /
MCNAMARA, Sharon 7 Laurel Trail Kinnelon, NJ 07073 / US | 03 /
SULIKOWSKI, Robert, T. 4646 Independence Boulevard Lumberton, NC 28358 / US | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2005/49] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk, Patent Attorneys, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04713762.5 | 23.02.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004US05331 | Priority number, date | US20030450950P | 28.02.2003 Original published format: US 450950 P | US20030417356 | 16.04.2003 Original published format: US 417356 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004077940 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1601246 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1601246 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01K29/00 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
A01K15/026 (EP,US);
A23K50/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PET-CHEWS UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON PET-CHEWS | [2005/49] | English: | PET CHEWS AND METHODS OF MAKING PET CHEWS | [2005/49] | French: | OS A MACHER ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION D'OS A MACHER | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2004 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 16.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.2007 | CH | 13.06.2007 | CY | 13.06.2007 | CZ | 13.06.2007 | EE | 13.06.2007 | LI | 13.06.2007 | RO | 13.06.2007 | SI | 13.06.2007 | SK | 13.06.2007 | TR | 13.06.2007 | BG | 13.09.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | HU | 14.12.2007 | LU | 23.02.2008 | IE | 25.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
HU | 14.12.2007 | ||
LU | 23.02.2008 | ||
IE | 25.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
LU | 23.02.2008 | ||
IE | 25.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
IE | 25.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
IE | 25.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
IE | 25.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CH | 13.06.2007 | ||
LI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2004062359 (SALIX LLC [US], et al) [E] 1-20 * the whole document *; | EP1513396 [ ] (SALIX LLC [US]) [ ] * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2185547 (JOHN FOWLER); | [A]US2988045 (FISHER STANTON E); | [A]US3198173 (FISHER STANTON E); | [A]US6277420 (ANDERSEN DAVID B [US], et al) |