EP1601472 - METHOD FOR TREATING THE INNER SURFACE OF A TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outokumpu Oyj Riihitontuntie 7 02200 Espoo / FI | [2005/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARJU, Terho Katariinankatu 10 D 49 FIN-28100 Pori / FI | 02 /
SALMINEN, Aleksi Riukuaidantie 3 FIN-28800 Pori / FI | 03 /
NORÈN, Timo Toejoenrantakatu 68 B FIN-28200Pori / FI | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstraße 64 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Zipse Habersack Kritzenberger Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04713921.7 | 24.02.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004FI00086 | Priority number, date | FI20030000344 | 07.03.2003 Original published format: FI 20030344 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004078372 | Date: | 16.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1601472 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1601472 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/02, B08B9/027, C22F1/08 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
B08B9/0436 (EP);
B08B9/0328 (EP);
B21C23/085 (EP);
B21C37/06 (EP);
B21C43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER INNENFLÄCHEN EINES ROHRS | [2005/49] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING THE INNER SURFACE OF A TUBE | [2005/49] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A TRAITER LA SURFACE INTERIEURE D'UN TUBE | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 25.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 01.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.12.2008
ADMISSIBLE Wieland-Werke AG D-89070 Ulm / DE | [2009/05] | 27.01.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.04.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 18.05.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.03.2008 | CH | 19.03.2008 | CY | 19.03.2008 | DK | 19.03.2008 | EE | 19.03.2008 | FI | 19.03.2008 | LI | 19.03.2008 | NL | 19.03.2008 | RO | 19.03.2008 | SI | 19.03.2008 | BG | 19.06.2008 | SE | 19.06.2008 | GR | 20.06.2008 | PT | 26.08.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2009/47] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
CH | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1461961 (LIEGE USINES CUIVRE ZINC); | [A]US4445350 (NISHIHARA MASAO [JP], et al); | [A]FR2623110 (VIRAX SA [FR]); | [X]EP0647723 (KABELMETAL AG [DE]) | Examination | JPH08213812 |