EP1597946 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AN ELECTRONIC MODULE, AND AN ELECTRONIC MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imbera Electronics Oy P.O. Box 74 02151 Espoo / FI | [2005/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUOMINEN, Risto Kivisaarentie 5 A 24 FIN-00960 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
PALM, Petteri Alkutie 47 As. 1 FIN-00660 Helsinki / FI | [2008/50] |
Former [2005/47] | 01 /
TUOMINEN, Risto Väinölänkatu 17 B 18 FIN-00610 Helsinki / FI | ||
02 /
PALM, Petteri Alkutie 47 As. 1 FIN-00660 Helsinki / FI | Representative(s) | Tiilikainen, Jarkko Tapio Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Tiilikainen, Jarkko Tapio Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B FIN-00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 04714344.1 | 25.02.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004FI00102 | Priority number, date | FI20030000293 | 26.02.2003 Original published format: FI 20030293 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004077903 | Date: | 10.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1597946 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/18, H01L21/70 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
H01L25/50 (EP,US);
H05K3/32 (KR);
H01L24/19 (EP,US);
H05K1/18 (KR);
H05K1/188 (EP,US);
H01L2223/54426 (EP,US);
H01L2224/04105 (EP,US);
H01L2224/20 (EP,US);
H01L25/105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01327 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN MODULS UND ELEKTRONISCHES MODUL | [2005/47] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AN ELECTRONIC MODULE, AND AN ELECTRONIC MODULE | [2005/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN MODULE ELECTRONIQUE ET MODULE ELECTRONIQUE | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 01.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6038133 (NAKATANI SEIICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]GB2204184 (BRACEY STANLEY); | [Y]DE4424396 (IBM [US]); | [A]US5042145 (BOUCQUET JAN P [BE]); | [A]US3480836 (ARONSTEIN JESSE) |