EP1630246 - TURBINE BLADE CAPABLE OF INHIBITING REACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | ||
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states Ishikawajima-Harima Heavy Industries Co., Ltd. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8182 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AOKI, Yasuhiro, C/o Ishikawajima-harima Heavy Ind. Co., Ltd, 2-2-1, Ohtemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8182 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Akihiro, C/o Ishikawajima-harima Heavy Ind. Co., Ltd, 2-2-1, Ohtemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8182 / JP | [2006/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04714441.5 | 25.02.2004 | [2006/09] | WO2004JP02184 | Priority number, date | JP20030154129 | 30.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003154129 | [2006/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004106578 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1630246 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1630246 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/28, C23C4/08, C23C28/02, C23C30/00 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
C23C10/02 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
F05C2201/0463 (EP,US);
F05D2300/132 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (US);
Y10T428/12847 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12861 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1291 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12931 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12944 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/09] | C23C10/48 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2006/14] |
Former [2006/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZUR INHIBIERUNG EINER REAKTION BEFÄHIGTE TURBINENSCHAUFEL | [2006/09] | English: | TURBINE BLADE CAPABLE OF INHIBITING REACTION | [2006/09] | French: | AUBE DE TURBINE PERMETTANT D'INHIBER UNE REACTION | [2006/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2005 | Translation filed | 15.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/09] | 25.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0532255 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * page 2, lines 7-11 * * page 3, lines 8-58 * * claim 2 *; | [X]JPH07238362 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]JPH09324256 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2,5-8 * abstract *; | [XD]EP0821076 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB], et al) [XD] 1,2,5-8 * column 1 * * column 3, line 40 - column 40, line 10 * * column 10, lines 9-40 *; | [XD]JPH10168556 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB], et al) [XD] 1,2,5-8* abstract *; | [A]US5935353 (MURPHY WENDY H [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1001046 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0011] , [0020] * * tables 1,2 *; | [XD]US6306524 (SPITSBERG IRENE T [US], et al) [XD] 1-8 * columns 1,2,5,6 *; | [X]US2002197502 (ZHAO JI-CHENG [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0006] , [0009] , [0011] , [0012] , [0018] - [0021] - [0023] , [0024] , [0027] , [0028] , [0033] , [0041] * * table 1 * * claim 28 * | International search | [X]JPH09324256 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JPH10168556 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB], et al); | [X]JPH1180920 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [X]JPH11172463 (HOWMET RES CORP); | [X]JP2000192258 (GE AVIAT SERVICES OPERATION PT) | by applicant | EP0821076 | US6306524 | US2002197502 |