EP1603275 - ACCESS POINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buffalo Inc. 15-Ban, 4-Chome, Shibatahondori Minami-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 457-8520 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states Buffalo Inc. 15-Ban, 4-Chome, Shibatahondori Minami-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 457-8520 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIDOSHIRO, Takashi, Buffalo Inc. 15-ban, Shibatahondori 4-chome Minami-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 457-8520 / JP | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Tothill, John Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Tothill, John Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/49] | Tothill, John Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street GB-London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04714487.8 | 25.02.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004JP02227 | Priority number, date | JP20030063081 | 10.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003063081 | [2005/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004082213 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1603275 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04Q7/30 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
H04W36/06 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUGANGSPUNKT | [2005/49] | English: | ACCESS POINT | [2005/49] | French: | POINT D'ACCES | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2005 | Translation filed | 15.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2005 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 20.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/20] | 03.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1096730 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] ** paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] *; | [A]US2001015967 (SUGIURA TOSHIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column A * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] *; | [X]EP1257090 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0040] *; | [X]US2003040319 (HANSEN CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [X] 1 * column A * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0043] * | International search | [X]JP2000022712 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2003037697 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO) |