EP1661011 - COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM PROVIDING ENHANCED CLIENT-SERVER COMMUNICATIONS AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Research in Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states Teamon Systems, Inc. 1180 NW Maple Street, Suite 201 Issaquah, Washington 98027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCARTHY, Steven J. 1733 127th Avenue SE Bellevue, Washington 98005 / US | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street GB-London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04714554.5 | 25.02.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004US05472 | Priority number, date | US20030494325P | 11.08.2003 Original published format: US 494325 P | US20040775674 | 10.02.2004 Original published format: US 775674 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005020037 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1661011 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1661011 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, H04L29/08 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
H04L63/029 (EP,US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/10 (EP,US);
H04L67/142 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/22] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | 09.03.2006 | LT | 09.03.2006 | LV | 09.03.2006 | MK | 09.03.2006 | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG ERWEITERTER CLIENT-SERVER-KOMMUNIKATION UND DIESBEZÜGLICHE VERFAHREN | [2006/22] | English: | COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM PROVIDING ENHANCED CLIENT-SERVER COMMUNICATIONS AND RELATED METHODS | [2006/22] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS A COMMUNICATIONS CLIENT-SERVEUR AMELIOREES ET SES PROCEDES | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 15.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | EP08160447.2 / EP1975805 | EP10151709.2 / EP2175616 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 08.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 08.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.04.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.10.2008 | BE | 01.10.2008 | CY | 01.10.2008 | CZ | 01.10.2008 | DK | 01.10.2008 | EE | 01.10.2008 | FI | 01.10.2008 | RO | 01.10.2008 | SI | 01.10.2008 | SK | 01.10.2008 | TR | 01.10.2008 | BG | 01.01.2009 | SE | 01.01.2009 | GR | 02.01.2009 | ES | 12.01.2009 | IE | 25.02.2009 | LU | 25.02.2009 | CH | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | PT | 02.03.2009 | HU | 02.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LU | 25.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
HU | 02.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
LU | 25.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
IE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | SI | 01.10.2008 | |
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/17] | SI | 01.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1081918 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 2,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0020] *; | [XY]WO0173522 (NETFISH TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,3-7,9-12 * abstract * * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 9 * * page 6, line 1 - page 12, line 8 * * claims 1-15 * [Y] 2,8; | [A]US2002087888 (YAMAKAWA TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0009] ** paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0075] *; | [A]US2003046374 (HILT PATRICK [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029] *; | [A] - FIELDING UC IRVINE J GETTYS J MOGUL DEC H FRYSTYK T BERNERS-LEE MIT/LCS R, "Hypertext Transfer Protocol -- HTTP/1.1; rfc2068.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (199701), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015007852 [A] 1,4,7,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [14.8] * * paragraph [14.20] * * paragraph [14.32] - paragraph [14.34] * * paragraph [14.46] * | International search | [A]US6473609 (SCHWARTZ BRUCE V [US], et al); | [YP]US2003177384 (JONES DOUGLAS L [US], et al); | [YE]US2004117615 (O'DONNELL WILLIAM [US], et al); | [YP]US6775687 (BINDING CARL [CH], et al) |