EP1597822 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, BASE STATION AND TRANSMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2008/08] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARJALAINEN, Miia Koivulehdontie 6 FIN-90630 Oulu / FI | 02 /
SAARINEN, Samu Rensselikuja 2 F FIN-90630 Oulu / FI | 03 /
HEINIKOSKI, Kauko Korpirouskuntie 25 FIN-90650 Oulu / FI | 04 /
TOLONEN, Teemu Pilkkitie 5 E 21 FIN-90550 Oulu / FI | 05 /
YLINEN, Juha Hintantie 92 B 11 FIN-90650 Oulu / FI | 06 /
SUONPERÄ, Jani Honkapirtintie 13 FIN-90630 Oulu / FI | 07 /
LEHTINEN, Risto 320 Chemin de L'Ouvaire F-06370 Mouans-sartoux / FR | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/47] | 01 /
KARJALAINEN, Miia Koivulehdontie 6 FIN-90630 Oulu / FI | ||
02 /
SAARINEN, Samu Rensselikuja 2 F FIN-90630 Oulu / FI | |||
03 /
HEINIKOSKI, Kauko Riihivainiontie 14 A 6 FIN-90440 Kempele / FI | |||
04 /
TOLONEN, Teemu Pilkkitie 5 E 21 FIN-90550 Oulu / FI | |||
05 /
YLINEN, Juha Hintantie 92 B 11 FIN-90650 Oulu / FI | |||
06 /
SUONPERÄ, Jani Honkapirtintie 13 FIN-90630 Oulu / FI | |||
07 /
LEHTINEN, Risto 320 Chemin de L'Ouvaire F-06370 Mouans-sartoux / FR | Representative(s) | Nylund, Solveig Helena Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Nylund, Solveig Helena Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 04714811.9 | 26.02.2004 | [2005/47] | WO2004FI00104 | Priority number, date | US20030449848P | 27.02.2003 Original published format: US 449848 P | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004077660 | Date: | 10.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1597822 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1597822 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 10.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/32 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
H03F1/3247 (EP,US);
H04B1/0475 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, BASISSTATION UND SENDER | [2005/47] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, BASE STATION AND TRANSMITTER | [2005/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES, STATION DE BASE ET TRANSMETTEUR | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 01.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.2008 | BE | 09.04.2008 | CY | 09.04.2008 | CZ | 09.04.2008 | DK | 09.04.2008 | EE | 09.04.2008 | FI | 09.04.2008 | IT | 09.04.2008 | NL | 09.04.2008 | RO | 09.04.2008 | SI | 09.04.2008 | SK | 09.04.2008 | TR | 09.04.2008 | BG | 09.07.2008 | SE | 09.07.2008 | GR | 10.07.2008 | ES | 20.07.2008 | PT | 10.09.2008 | HU | 10.10.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
GR | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
GR | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 09.04.2008 | |
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 09.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5252930 (BLAUVELT HENRY A [US]); | [A]WO0108294 (DATUM TELEGRAPHIC INC [CA]); | [A]EP1085668 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [XP]US2003184372 (FUDABA NOBUKAZU [JP], et al) |