01.11.2013 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
04.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] |
15.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
21.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
09.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
21.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] |
15.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
01.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
25.05.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
04.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] |
27.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
20.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
09.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] |
15.12.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
29.09.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] |
16.06.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] |
14.06.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.06.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.05.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
03.02.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.12.2005 |
Change - inventor |
published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] |
21.12.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.10.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] |
14.10.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] |
24.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|