EP1601601 - AN UNWINDER DEVICE FOR REELS OF WEB-LIKE MATERIAL WITH TEMPORARY ACCUMULATOR MEMBERS FOR THE MATERIAL UNWOUND IN THE PHASE OF REEL SUBSTITUTION AND RELATIVE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FABIO PERINI S.p.A. Zona Ind.le P.I.P. Mugnano Sud 55100 Lucca / IT | [2005/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENVENUTI, Angelo Via del Chiasso, 327 I-55100 Lucca / IT | 02 /
MORELLI, Roberto Via della Chiesa, 889 I-55056 S. Maria a Colle / IT | 03 /
MADDALENI, Romano Via Valdinievole Sud 102 I-56013 Bientina / IT | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Mannucci, Michele Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci, Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 04715440.6 | 27.02.2004 | [2005/49] | WO2004IT00091 | Priority number, date | IT2003FI00065 | 13.03.2003 Original published format: IT FI20030065 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004080869 | Date: | 23.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1601601 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1601601 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/18 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
B65H19/1863 (EP,US);
B65H19/18 (KR);
B65H19/12 (EP);
B65H19/1836 (EP,US);
B65H19/24 (KR);
B65H2301/41352 (EP);
B65H2301/41361 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4602 (EP,US);
B65H2301/46115 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINE ABWICKELVORRICHTUNG FÜR ROLLEN VON BAHNMATERIAL MIT ZEITWEISER SPEICHERUNG FÜR DAS ABGEWICKELTE MATERIAL IN DER PHASE DES ROLLENWECHSELS UND DAZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2005/49] | English: | AN UNWINDER DEVICE FOR REELS OF WEB-LIKE MATERIAL WITH TEMPORARY ACCUMULATOR MEMBERS FOR THE MATERIAL UNWOUND IN THE PHASE OF REEL SUBSTITUTION AND RELATIVE METHOD | [2005/49] | French: | DEVIDOIR DE MATERIAU EN BANDE A ACCUMULATEUR TEMPORAIRE DU MATERIAU DEROULE DANS UNE ETAPE DE SUBSTITUTION DE BOBINE, ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2005/49] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 07.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.03.2007 | CY | 21.03.2007 | CZ | 21.03.2007 | DK | 21.03.2007 | EE | 21.03.2007 | FI | 21.03.2007 | NL | 21.03.2007 | RO | 21.03.2007 | SI | 21.03.2007 | SK | 21.03.2007 | TR | 21.03.2007 | BG | 21.06.2007 | GR | 22.06.2007 | PT | 21.08.2007 | HU | 22.09.2007 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | BE | 21.03.2007 | |
CY | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
BG | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
HU | 22.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/41] | BE | 21.03.2007 | |
CY | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
BG | 21.06.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 21.03.2007 | |
CY | 21.03.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | BE | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
EE | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | BE | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
GR | 22.06.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | BE | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
DK | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | BE | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
RO | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | BE | 21.03.2007 | |
CZ | 21.03.2007 | ||
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | BE | 21.03.2007 | |
FI | 21.03.2007 | ||
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
SK | 21.03.2007 | ||
PT | 21.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | FI | 21.03.2007 | |
NL | 21.03.2007 | ||
SI | 21.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | FI | 21.03.2007 | |
NL | 21.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1233686 (BENZ & HILGERS G M B H) [A] * figure - *; | [A]US3989576 (COLLIN HEINRICH, et al) [A] * figure 1 *; | [A]US4695007 (MUTO YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] * figures 13-16 *; | [A]DE19818384 (KUEHL ENTWICKLUNG UND GERAETEB [DE]) [A] * figure 1 *; | [XA]DE10002686 (MAIER CHRISTIAN MASCH [DE]) [X] 1-4,13,19-21,25-27 * the whole document * [A] 5-12,14-18,22-24,28-30; | [XA]EP1162164 (GD SPA [IT]) [X] 1-8,16,19-21,23,25 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0066]; figure - * [A] 9-15,17,18,24,26-30; | [XA]WO0232799 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,19-22,25,26 [A] 3,5-7,10-18,23,24,27-30 |